Plummer v. TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jollenta Plummer
Defendant: TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC doing business as Men's Club of Charlotte, ABDUR RASCHID CHAWDHARY, Lloyd J Ace, III, Doe Managers 1 through 3 and Does 4 through 10
Case Number: 3:2021cv00648
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF by Lloyd J Ace, III, Abdur Raschid Chawdhary, TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC re: #11 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order in Chavez v. Creative Impact Inc, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Lloyd Ace, #4 Exhibit 3 - Complaint in Chavez v. Creative Impact Inc., #5 Exhibit 4 - De Angelis v. Natl. Entmt. Grp., LLC, #6 Exhibit 5 - Email of December 15, 2021)(Ledford, Joseph)
December 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per Rule 12(b)(1) by Lloyd J Ace, III, Abdur Raschid Chawdhary, TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC. Responses due by 1/6/2022 (Ledford, Joseph)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent to Join as to Kirsten Cavanaugh by Jollenta Plummer (Attachments: #1 Kirsten Cavanaugh Signed Consent)(Martinez, Jesenia)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC (Ledford, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Ledford on behalf of Lloyd J Ace, III, Abdur Raschid Chawdhary, TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC (Ledford, Joseph)
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jollenta Plummer. Lloyd J Ace, III served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021; Abdur Raschid Chawdhary served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021; TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Phillips, Randall)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jesenia Martinez for Jollenta Plummer (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/7/2021. (mek)
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jesenia Martinez Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5347134. by Jollenta Plummer. (Phillips, Randall). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 7, 2021 Notice to Jesenia Martinez: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 12/14/2021. (mek)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jollenta Plummer (Phillips, Randall)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lloyd J Ace, III, Abdur Raschid Chawdhary, TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(js)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Joseph Phillips on behalf of Jollenta Plummer (Phillips, Randall)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jollenta Plummer with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5346352), filed by Jollenta Plummer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Randall)
December 6, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
December 6, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plummer v. TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jollenta Plummer
Represented By: Randall Joseph Phillips
Represented By: Jesenia Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMC Restaurant of Charlotte, LLC doing business as Men's Club of Charlotte
Represented By: Joseph L. Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDUR RASCHID CHAWDHARY
Represented By: Joseph L. Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J Ace, III
Represented By: Joseph L. Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Managers 1 through 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?