Crisp v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sarah Crisp
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv00678
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms) (hms)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/5/2022. (hms)
December 23, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sarah Crisp. (Piemonte, George)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sarah Crisp.(Piemonte, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crisp v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Crisp
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?