Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. v. Elsevier Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Elsevier Inc. and Elsevier LTD
Case Number: 3:2022cv00034
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.. Elsevier LTD served on 3/11/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (Muckenfuss, Robert)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Elsevier Inc., Elsevier LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cooney, James). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendants' answer due 4/15/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/28/2022. (DLG)
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.. Elsevier Inc. served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. (Muckenfuss, Robert)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Yates Ellis on behalf of Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. (Ellis, Jonathan)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anderson Warlich on behalf of Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. (Warlich, Kelly)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(js)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Z. Timmermans on behalf of Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. (Timmermans, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. (Muckenfuss, Robert)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elsevier Inc., Elsevier LTD with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5410474), filed by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Article and Supplemental Data, #2 Exhibit B-Letter from R. Muckenfuss to Q. Chen, #3 Exhibit C-Deposition Excerpts of Y. Zeng, #4 Exhibit D-GPS Third Party Testing Webpage, #5 Exhibit E-Email String between B. Stephens to Y. Zeng, #6 Exhibit F-GPS Third Amended Complaint with Exhibits, #7 Exhibit G-4-19-2021 Test Matrix Email)(Muckenfuss, Robert)
January 26, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. v. Elsevier Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Z. Timmermans
Represented By: Robert A. Muckenfuss
Represented By: Jonathan Yates Ellis
Represented By: Kelly Anderson Warlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsevier Inc.
Represented By: James P Cooney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsevier LTD
Represented By: James P Cooney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?