Chambers v. North Carolina Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Chambers
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Justice, Timothy Rodgers and Robin Pendergraft
Case Number: 3:2022cv00037
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Margaret Chambers. Replies due by 3/28/2022 (Miano, Bert)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 3/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/11/22. (mga)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Margaret Chambers. Responses due by 3/25/2022 (Miano, Bert). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by North Carolina Department of Justice, Robin Pendergraft, Timothy Rodgers. (Henderson, Tamika)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by North Carolina Department of Justice, Robin Pendergraft, Timothy Rodgers. Responses due by 3/14/2022 (Henderson, Tamika)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal. North Carolina Department of Justice answer due 3/1/2022; Robin Pendergraft answer due 3/1/2022; Timothy Rodgers answer due 3/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/31/2022. (mek)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by North Carolina Department of Justice, Robin Pendergraft, Timothy Rodgers. (Henderson, Tamika). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 21-CVS-18855. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5411582), filed by Robin Pendergraft, Timothy Rodgers, North Carolina Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint & Summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet)(Henderson, Tamika)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. North Carolina Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Chambers
Represented By: Bert Joseph Miano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Justice
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Rodgers
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Pendergraft
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?