Smith v. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Plaintiff: Smith M Youndolyn and Youndolyn M. Smith
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00102
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Three (3) Days. Discovery due by 1/17/2023. Mediation TBD. Motions due by 2/14/2023. Jury Trial set for 5/1/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 5/4/2022. (brl)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Short, Carl)
April 11, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 5/2/2022. (brl)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc..(Short, Carl)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A - Complaint by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Short, Carl). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.'s answer due 4/8/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/16/2022. (DLG)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. (Short, Carl)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg, case number 22-cvs-2076. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5476444), filed by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Short, Carl)
March 11, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith M Youndolyn
Represented By: Eric Albert Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youndolyn M. Smith
Represented By: Eric Albert Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon M. Shelton
Represented By: Carl M. Short, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?