Shen v. Akoustis Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ya Annia Shen
Defendant: Akoustis Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00103
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan. ALL Parties DO NOT Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction by Akoustis Technologies, Inc. (Wooten, Virginia) Modified to correct event on 4/8/2022 (js).
March 24, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 4/12/2022. (clc)
March 21, 2022 Docketing Error - Attorney admitted and registered in this court.
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Akoustis Technologies, Inc..(Klass, David)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia M. Wooten on behalf of Akoustis Technologies, Inc. (Wooten, Virginia)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Akoustis Technologies, Inc. (Klass, David)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of North Carolina Mecklenburg County, case number 22-cvs-2643. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5477272), filed by Akoustis Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Removal (State))(Klass, David)
March 11, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
March 11, 2022 Notice to Josh Van Kampen: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Western District of North Carolina Federal Court. Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/18/2022. (js)
March 11, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shen v. Akoustis Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ya Annia Shen
Represented By: Josh Van Kampen
Represented By: Joshua Reed Van Kampen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akoustis Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: David Isaac Klass
Represented By: Virginia M. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?