Nielsen v. ADM Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicholas Nielsen
Defendant: ADM Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00159
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Kallianos, Chris)
May 4, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by ADM Trucking, Inc..(Bessellieu, Denise) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/5/2022) (tlj). (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/5/2022) (tlj).
May 4, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 5/23/2022. (clc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint contained in the Notice of Removal. ADM Trucking, Inc. answer due 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/14/22. (mga)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by ADM Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Bessellieu, Denise). Motions referred to David Keesler.
April 14, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)
April 14, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADM Trucking, Inc. (Bessellieu, Denise)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise L. Bessellieu on behalf of ADM Trucking, Inc. (Bessellieu, Denise)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg, case number 22-CVS-3957. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5527351), filed by ADM Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Bessellieu, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nielsen v. ADM Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Nielsen
Represented By: Chris M Kallianos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADM Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Denise L. Bessellieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?