McDaniel v. The McClatchy Company et al
Plaintiff: Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel
Defendant: The McClatchy Company, McClatchy Investment Company, McClatchy Newspapers Inc., The McClatchy Company doing business as The Charlotte Observer and Does
Case Number: 3:2022cv00166
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to #7 Notice of Appeal, #9 Notice of Appeal. [22-1607] (ejb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 22-1607 for #7 Notice of Appeal, #9 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Anisha Walker. (hms)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal (tlj)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Appeal (tlj)
June 3, 2022 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #7 Notice of Appeal. (tlj)
June 3, 2022 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #9 Notice of Appeal. (tlj)
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 Pro Se NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #6 Clerk's Judgment by Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel. (IFP) (tlj)
June 2, 2022 Filing 7 Pro Se NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel. (IFP) (tlj)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/23/22. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (clc)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Relief from #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/23/22. (clc)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 Po Se Rule 60(b) MOTION for Relief from #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (tlj). Modified on 5/12/2022 to remove referral (mek).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee within 21 days of this Order or this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to the Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/19/22. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
April 20, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fee due by 5/11/2022. (ef)
April 19, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
April 19, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The order was served conventionally. (js)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel. (js)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. The McClatchy Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McClatchy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClatchy Investment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClatchy Newspapers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McClatchy Company doing business as The Charlotte Observer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?