Shakespeare et al v. Novant Healthcare Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Colin Shakespeare, Sonya Jackson-Shakespeare and Colin Shakespeare
Defendant: Novant Healthcare Inc., Fabiola Piercy and Presbyterian Hospital doing business as Novant Health Presbyterian Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2022cv00317
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Randolph L. Lee on behalf of All Defendants (Lee, Randolph)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novant Healthcare Inc. (Moyers, Gary)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Presbyterian Hospital (Moyers, Gary)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Adam Moyers on behalf of All Defendants (Moyers, Gary)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Colin Shakespeare, Sonya Jackson-Shakespeare. Novant Healthcare Inc. waiver sent on 7/21/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Robinson, Sharika)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Colin Shakespeare, Sonya Jackson-Shakespeare. Fabiola Piercy waiver sent on 7/21/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Robinson, Sharika)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Sonya Jackson-Shakespeare, Colin Shakespeare. Amendment to #1 Complaint, (Robinson, Sharika) Modified text on 7/21/2022 (clc).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (tlj)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5660781), filed by Colin Shakespeare, Sonya Jackson-Shakespeare. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses to Defendants, #3 Shakespeare, Sonya Corporate Disclosure Form, #4 Shakespeare, Colin Corporate Disclosure Form, #5 Attorney Robinson Notice of Appearance)(Robinson, Sharika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shakespeare et al v. Novant Healthcare Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Colin Shakespeare
Represented By: Sharika Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Jackson-Shakespeare
Represented By: Sharika Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Shakespeare
Represented By: Sharika Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novant Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Gary Adam Moyers
Represented By: Randolph L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabiola Piercy
Represented By: Gary Adam Moyers
Represented By: Randolph L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presbyterian Hospital doing business as Novant Health Presbyterian Medical Center
Represented By: Gary Adam Moyers
Represented By: Randolph L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?