Baker Roofing Company v. Walbridge Aldinger LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel. and Baker Roofing Company
Defendant: Walbridge Aldinger LLC, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00330
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/28/2022 (brl)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion to Stay. This matter is stayed pending further Order of the Court. In addition to the periodic updates Defendants will provide Plaintiff as stated in the Motion, the parties shall file a status report ninety days from the date of this Order and every ninety days thereafter. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/29/2022. (DLG)
August 26, 2022 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Joseph B. Shelton, III re #11 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walbridge Aldinger LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company (Sugg, Richard)
August 26, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 Consent MOTION to Stay by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walbridge Aldinger LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract)(Sugg, Richard)
August 26, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Stay by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walbridge Aldinger LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sugg, Richard). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland answer due 9/6/2022; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 9/6/2022; Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 9/6/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/11/2022. (DLG)
August 10, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Lincoln on behalf of Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company (Lincoln, Sara)
August 10, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Sugg, Richard). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Lincoln on behalf of Walbridge Aldinger LLC (Lincoln, Sara)
August 8, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Walbridge Aldinger LLC. (Sugg, Richard). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Walbridge Aldinger LLC's answer due 9/6/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/8/2022. (DLG)
August 5, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Walbridge Aldinger LLC answer due 8/15/2022, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 8/16/2022, Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 8/16/2022, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland answer due 8/16/2022. (brl)
August 4, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Baker Roofing Company (Jarrett, C.). Walbridge Aldinger LLC served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company and Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland served on 7/26/2022, answer due 8/16/2022. Modified to add service and answer dates on 8/5/2022 (brl).
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Black, Jr on behalf of Baker Roofing Company (Black, William)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Hamilton (Hank) Jarrett, III on behalf of Baker Roofing Company (Jarrett, C.)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Walbridge Aldinger LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ef)
July 22, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ef)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Roofing Company (Jarrett, C.)
July 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5666393), filed by United States of America, ex rel., Baker Roofing Company.(Jarrett, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker Roofing Company v. Walbridge Aldinger LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel.
Represented By: C. Hamilton (Hank) Jarrett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker Roofing Company
Represented By: C. Hamilton (Hank) Jarrett, III
Represented By: William M. Black, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walbridge Aldinger LLC
Represented By: Richard Jeremy Sugg
Represented By: Sara R. Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Jeremy Sugg
Represented By: Sara R. Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Richard Jeremy Sugg
Represented By: Sara R. Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Richard Jeremy Sugg
Represented By: Sara R. Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?