Schaefer Systems International, Inc. v. Aloft Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Schaefer Systems International, Inc.
Defendant: Aloft Media, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00513
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Derek Dahlgren for Aloft Media, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/17/22. (mga)
November 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Derek Dahlgren Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5831113. by Aloft Media, LLC. (Grimes, J.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 17, 2022 Notice to Derek Dahlgren: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/28/2022. (mga)
November 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Douglas Grimes on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Grimes, J.)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Aloft Media, LLC answer due 11/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/24/22. (mga)
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Schaefer Systems International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Long, Samuel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 10, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Schaefer Systems International, Inc.. Aloft Media, LLC served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Long, Samuel)
September 30, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (tlj)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Aloft Media, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
September 30, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tlj)
September 30, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
September 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas D. Garber on behalf of Schaefer Systems International, Inc. (Garber, Lucas)
September 29, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tom Bengera on behalf of Schaefer Systems International, Inc. (Bengera, Tom)
September 29, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schaefer Systems International, Inc. (Long, Samuel)
September 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aloft Media, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5766192), filed by Schaefer Systems International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. U.S. Patent No. 10,042,823, #2 Exhibit 2. U.S. Patent No. 10,078,623, #3 Exhibit 3. U.S. Patent No. 10,372,793, #4 Exhibit 4. U.S. Patent No. 10,482,164, #5 Exhibit 5. U.S. Patent No. 11,308,260, #6 Exhibit 6. 3/4/2022 Letter from Aloft Media, #7 Exhibit 7. Claim Charts for '823 Patent, #8 Exhibit 8. Claim Charts for '623 Patent, #9 Exhibit 9. Claim Charts for '793 Patent, #10 Exhibit 10. Claim Charts for '164 Patent, #11 Exhibit 11. Claim Chart for '260 Patent, #12 Exhibit 12. Schaefer Home Page, #13 Exhibit 13. Page Source Code for Home Page, #14 Exhibit 14. Apparel Web Page, #15 Exhibit 15. Page Source Code for Apparel Page, #16 Exhibit 16. 5/9/2022 Email with Licensing Demand, #17 Exhibit 17. List of Purported Licensees)(Long, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaefer Systems International, Inc. v. Aloft Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schaefer Systems International, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas D. Garber
Represented By: Tom Bengera
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Long, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloft Media, LLC
Represented By: Derek Dahlgren
Represented By: J. Douglas Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?