Lynch et al v. Tames et al
Plaintiff: James Lynch and Shannon Lynch
Defendant: Black Diamond JA LC, Leeco Steel LLC, D&F Equipment Sales Incorporated, Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated, Tuff Coat LLC doing business as Bulley Line NWA, LLC and Nucor Corporation
Cross Claimant: James Jim Tames doing business as Black Diamond Body Armor
Case Number: 3:2023cv00029
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 128 RESPONSE to Defendant Nucor Corp's 12(b)(6) Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. Replies due 3/14/2023 (Marzak, Matthew) Modified text on 3/13/2023 (mek).
March 1, 2023 Filing 127 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Huseth, Fielding)
February 21, 2023 Filing 126 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Nucor Corporation. Responses due by 3/7/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Nucor's Motion to Dismiss) (Huseth, Fielding). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 21, 2023 Filing 125 NOTICE of and regarding Certificate of Settlement Conference by Nucor Corporation (Huseth, Fielding)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew M Marzak for James Lynch and Shannon Lynch (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/13/23. (mga)
February 13, 2023 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Marzak Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5940582. by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Harris, S.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 13, 2023 Notice to Matthew M. Marzak: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 2/21/2023. (mga)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #118 Defendant Nucor Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Nucor Corporation answer due 2/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/25/23. (mga)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James F Bennett for Nucor Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/25/23. (mga)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew K. Crane for Nucor Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/25/23. (mga)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Caitlin O'Connell for Nucor Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/25/23. (mga)
January 25, 2023 Notice to Caitlin O'Connell: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 2/1/2023. (mga)
January 25, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Compliance Deadline reset to 2/8/2023 for Matthew M Marzak to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. (rth)
January 25, 2023 Notice to Matthew K. Crane: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 2/1/2023. (mga)
January 25, 2023 Notice to James F. Bennett: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 2/1/2023. (mga)
January 24, 2023 Filing 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Huseth, Fielding). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 24, 2023 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James F. Bennett Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5913011. by Nucor Corporation. (Huseth, Fielding). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 24, 2023 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew K. Crane Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5912959. by Nucor Corporation. (Huseth, Fielding). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 24, 2023 Filing 115 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Caitlin E. O'Connell Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5912956. by Nucor Corporation. (Huseth, Fielding). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 24, 2023 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Tyler on behalf of Nucor Corporation (Tyler, Scott)
January 24, 2023 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Fielding E. Huseth on behalf of Nucor Corporation (Huseth, Fielding)
January 17, 2023 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (rth)
January 17, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Nucor Corporation answer due 1/31/2023. (rth)
January 17, 2023 Notice to Matthew M Marzak, Caitlin O'Connell, James F Bennett, Matthew Crane: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 1/24/2023. (rth)
January 13, 2023 Filing 112 Case transferred in from District of Arizona as it pertains to Defendant Nucor Corporation; Case Number 2:22-cv-01807. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
January 13, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER- The Clerk's Office shall transfer this case, as it pertains to Defendants D&F Equipment Sales Incorporated, Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated, and Leeco Steel, to the Western District of Arkansas. The Clerk's Office shall transfer this case, as it pertains to Defendant Nucor Corporation, to the Western District of North Carolina. The case shall be terminated in the District of Arizona. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/13/23. (SMF) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 13, 2023 Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Arkansas by electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMF) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 12, 2023 Filing 110 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Conference held on 1/12/2023. Discussion is held regarding jurisdicion. Order to issue. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Matthew Marzak for Plaintiffs. Kenneth Januszewski, Laura Kugler, James Bennett for Defendants. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly.) Hearing held 2:02 PM to 2:06 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM regarding transfer per court order of January 5, 2023 #104 Order,,, Terminate Motion Hearing,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, by Defendant Leeco Steel LLC. (O'Daniel, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM Plaintiffs' Transfer Memorandum by Plaintiff James Lynch. (Marzak, Matthew) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM Defendant Nucor Corp.'s Memorandum Regarding Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 #104 Order,,, Terminate Motion Hearing,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, by Defendant Nucor Corporation. (Bennett, James) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM Defendants D&F & AMW's Memorandum Concerning Transfer Per Court's 1/5/23 Order #104 Order,,, Terminate Motion Hearing,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, by Defendants Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated, D&F Equipment Sales Incorporated. (Januszewski, Kenneth) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 5, 2023 Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER: The dial-in number for the hearing January 12 is 866-390-1828, access code 5861608. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: By the close of business on January 10, 2023, Defendants shall file short memoranda identifying the court or courts to which they believe the claims against them should be transferred. Oral argument on the pending motions to dismiss scheduled for January 12 at 2:00 p.m. will not occur, but the Court will require the parties to call in at that time to discuss where these claims should be transferred. See attachment for further details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/5/2023. (CLB) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Filing 103 RESPONSE to Motion re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #94 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #93 MOTION to Dismiss Party D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. and Arkansas Machine Works, Inc. filed by James Lynch. (Marzak, Matthew) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Filing 102 RESPONSE to Motion re: #98 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Lynch. (Marzak, Matthew) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #94 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Nucor Corporation. (Bennett, James) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 28, 2022 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Leeco Steel LLC. (O'Daniel, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Remark: Out of state attorneys J Stephen Ravel and Kelly Ransom terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Remark: Out of state attorney Edward Morris Slaughter terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #93 MOTION to Dismiss Party D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. and Arkansas Machine Works, Inc. filed by Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated, D & F Equipment Sales Incorporated. (Januszewski, Kenneth) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nucor Corporation. (Bennett, James) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 14, 2022 Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER: The Telephonic Oral Argument set for 1/3/2023 is RESET to 1/12/2023 at 2:00 PM before Senior Judge David G Campbell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 12, 2022 Filing 96 RESPONSE to Motion re: #93 MOTION to Dismiss Party D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. and Arkansas Machine Works, Inc., #94 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #95 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by James Lynch. (Marzak, Matthew) *Modified linkage on 12/21/2022 (DXD). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 8, 2022 Remark: Out of state attorneys Alicia K Patterson, Maverick Ray, Robert Stem Jr., Muhammad Suleiman Aziz, Marcy M. Erwin, Robert L Craig Jr., and Mark Chisholm terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Leeco Steel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Order)(O'Daniel, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nucor Corporation. (Bennett, James) *Modified to correct event on 12/21/2022 (DXD). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 1, 2022 Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss Party D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. and Arkansas Machine Works, Inc. by Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated, D & F Equipment Sales Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Januszewski, Kenneth) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 1, 2022 Filing 92 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #91 MOTION to Dismiss Party D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. and Arkansas Machine Works, Inc. by Defendants Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated, D & F Equipment Sales Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Januszewski, Kenneth) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
December 1, 2022 Filing 91 *Withdrawn per (Doc. #92 )* MOTION to Dismiss Party D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. and Arkansas Machine Works, Inc. by Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated, D & F Equipment Sales Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Januszewski, Kenneth) Modified on 12/21/2022 (DXD). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 10, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Laura Kugler on behalf of Defendant Leeco Steel LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 90 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge David G Campbell: Telephonic Conference held on 11/7/2022. Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #82 , Black Diamond's cross-claims against Nucor and Leeco are dismissed and these parties are terminated. Order to follow. Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction are due by 12/2/2022, responses due by 12/16/2022, replies due by 12/30/2022. Nucor's revised 12(b)(6) motion is due by 12/16/2022 and shall be briefed in accordance with the Local Rules. APPEARANCES: Matthew Marzak for Plaintiffs. Mark Chisholm and Keith Olbricht for Defendants D&F Equipment Sales, Inc. and Arkansas Machine Works. Clark Richards for Defendants James Tames and Black Diamond JA, LC. Laura Kugler for Leeco Steel, LLC. James Bennett and Matthew Crane for Defendant Nucor Corporation. Telephonic Oral Argument is set for 1/3/2023 at 3:00 PM before Senior Judge David G Campbell. (Court Reporter Teri Veres.) Hearing held 1:01 PM to 1:23 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: Pending before the Court is the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Cross Claims Without Prejudice of James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC. Doc. #82 . IT IS ORDERED Black Diamond's cross claims against Leeco (Doc. #32 ) and their amended cross claims against Nucor (Doc. #48 ) are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/7/22. (SST) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 88 *MEMORANDUM Case Status to Court by Plaintiffs James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Marzak, Matthew) *Modified to add additional filer and reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 11/7/2022 (SST). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM Re Status of the Case 80 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, 84 Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, by Defendants Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated, D & F Equipment Sales Incorporated. (Olbricht, Keith) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 86 *MEMORANDUM Leeco Steel, LLC's Memorandum on the Status of the Case by Defendant Leeco Steel LLC. (Kugler, Laura) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violations; attorney noticed on 11/7/2022 (SST). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 3, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Alan Olbricht on behalf of Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated, D & F Equipment Sales Incorporated. (Olbricht, Keith) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Due to a clerical error and not all parties getting notification of today's hearing, the telephonic conference set for 11/2/2022 is RESET to 11/7/2022 at 01:00 PM (Arizona) before Senior Judge David G Campbell. The parties shall each file a 3-page memo no later than Monday, 11/7/2022 at 9:00 a.m., stating their views on what the status of the case is and what needs to happen next. The dial-in number for Monday's hearing is 888-363-4735, access code 5696462. Ordered by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/2/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 83 *MEMORANDUM REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS OF JAMES JIM TAMES D/B/A BLACK DIAMOND BODY ARMOR, BLACK DIAMOND JA LC, AND TUFF COAT LLC D/B/A BULLET LINER NWA, LLC by Defendants Black Diamond JA LC, James Jim Tames. (Saffer, Jonathan) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 11/3/2022 (SST). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 82 *NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Black Diamond JA LC, James Jim Tames. (Saffer, Jonathan) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 11/3/2022 (SST). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 81 *MEMORANDUM Defendant Nucor Corp.'s Memorandum Regarding Status of the Case in Accordance with the Court's Order 80 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, by Defendant Nucor Corporation. (Crane, Matthew) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 11/3/2022 (SST). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew M Marzak on behalf of Plaintiffs James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
October 27, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew Crane, James F Bennett, Caitlin O'Connell on behalf of Defendant Nucor Corporation, Cross Defendant Nucor Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED a Telephone Status Conference is set for 11/2/2022 at 02:30 PM (Arizona) before Senior Judge David G Campbell. The parties shall each file a 3-page memo stating their views on what the status of the case is and what needs to happen next. Ordered by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/26/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
October 21, 2022 Filing 79 Letter Re Transfer of 6:21-cv-00130-ADA from the Western District of Texas to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-22-1807-PHX-DGC. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
October 21, 2022 Filing 78 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-00130 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. GRANTING #38 Motion to Dismiss. GRANTING #39 Motion to Dismiss. GRANTING #50 Motion to Dismiss. GRANTING #26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court additionally ORDERS the claims against Leeco Steel, LLC, Arkansas Machine Works, Inc., D&F Equipment Sales, Inc., and Nucor Corp. to be transferred to the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
October 3, 2022 Filing 76 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 9-29-22, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 2546660904. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/24/2022, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2022, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2023, (kd) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
September 29, 2022 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Miscellaneous Hearing (Motion Hearing) held on 9/29/2022. PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY. STATEMENTS AND ARGUMENTS OF COUNSEL HEAR. MOTION GRANTED Motion to transfer. WRITTEN ORDER FORTHCOMING - Motion to transfer granted, mooting all other pending motions. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(zv) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
September 28, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Ellis Kugler on behalf of Leeco Steel, LLC. Attorney Laura Ellis Kugler added to party Leeco Steel, LLC(pty:dft) (Kugler, Laura) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alicia K. Patterson for James Lynch and Shannon Lynch. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 72 BRIEF Supplemental regarding #45 Response to Motion by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Muhammad Suleiman Aziz for Alicia K. Patterson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16565087) by on behalf of James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Setting Zoom Motion Hearing for 9/29/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
July 14, 2022 Filing 68 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Leeco Steel, LLC, re #67 Opposed MOTION to Strike #64 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #32 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , #65 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Black Diamond JA LC, #64 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #32 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Cross Defendant Leeco Steel, LLC and in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Respond to Cross-Claims (Slaughter, Edward) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
June 30, 2022 Filing 67 Opposed MOTION to Strike #64 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #32 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , #65 Answer to Crossclaim by Black Diamond JA LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Leeco Steel, LLC, re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(2) AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(3); OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) filed by Cross Defendant Leeco Steel, LLC Supplemental Brief in Support (Slaughter, Edward) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Filing 65 Opposed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Under Rule 9(b) ANSWER to #32 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Leeco Steel, LLC.(Slaughter, Edward) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Filing 64 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #32 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Leeco Steel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit State Court Motion to Dismiss Black Diamond Cross-Claims). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Slaughter, Edward) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 10, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 7, 2022 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Black Diamond JA LC, James Jim Tames, re #50 MOTION to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Amended Cross Claims Against Nucor filed by Nucor Corporation (Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 62 Sealed Document filed. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document, # 2 Sealed Document, # 3 Sealed Document, # 4 Sealed Document) (ir) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING 60 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Court GRANTS the Motion as unopposed under Local Rule CV-7(d)(2). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 UNDER SEAL. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eglc) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 61 BRIEF Supplemental Brief Regarding Personal Jurisdiction in Support of Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Black Diamond's Amended Crossclaims by Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 60 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Referral Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document E, # 2 Sealed Document F, # 3 Sealed Document K, # 4 Sealed Document O, # 5 Sealed Document P, # 6 Proposed Order) (Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 59 BRIEF Regarding Personal Jurisdiction Over Leeco and Nucor regarding #50 MOTION to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Amended Cross Claims Against Nucor by Black Diamond JA LC, James Jim Tames. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Clark Richards, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R)(Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (ir) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION for Protective Order by Leeco Steel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Slaughter, Edward) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 56 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 8-16-21, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 9/13/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2021, (kd) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Motion Hearing held on 8/16/2021. Case called for motion hearing. Court heard argument on pending motions, and asked parties to provide more information and a further hearing will be held. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(ir) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert L. Craig, Jr ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15120211) by on behalf of Arkansas Machine Works, Inc., D & F Equipment Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Craig, Robert) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark Chisholm for Arkansas Machine Works, Inc., and for D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Nucor Corporation, re #50 MOTION to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Amended Cross Claims Against Nucor filed by Nucor Corporation (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 52 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Black Diamond JA LC, James Jim Tames, re #50 MOTION to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Amended Cross Claims Against Nucor filed by Nucor Corporation (Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Nucor Corporation, re #50 MOTION to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Amended Cross Claims Against Nucor filed by Nucor Corporation (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
May 21, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Amended Cross Claims Against Nucor by Nucor Corporation. (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 49 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Black Diamond JA LC, James Jim Tames, re #39 MOTION to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Cross-Claims Against Nucor filed by Nucor Corporation (Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 48 AMENDED CROSSCLAIM against Nucor Corporation amending, filed by James Jim Tames, Black Diamond JA LC.(Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Nucor Corporation, re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Nucor Corporation (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 28, 2021 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The deadline for Defendant Nucor Corporation to file a reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 39) is hereby extended to May 28, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch, re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Nucor Corporation (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The requested relief has been granted pursuant to ECF No. 43. Thus, the instant Motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #43 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The deadline for the parties to submit a joint, proposed scheduling and discovery plan is hereby extended to 14 days after the Court rules on all motions to dismiss pursuant Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and/or 12(b)(3). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Defendants James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC are GRANTED an extension of time to file their Response to Defendant Nucor Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Cross-Claims Against Nucor (ECF No. 39), up to and including May 14, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #39 MOTION to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Cross-Claims Against Nucor by Black Diamond JA LC, James Jim Tames. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 43 Amended MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 42 Rule 7 Disclosure Disclosure by Arkansas Machine Works, Inc., D & F Equipment Sales, Inc... (Craig, Robert) Modified from Motion on 4/21/2021 (lad). [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Plan by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 40 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nucor Corporation. (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss James Jim Tames d/b/a Black Diamond Body Armor and Black Diamond JA LC's Cross-Claims Against Nucor by Nucor Corporation. (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch, re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Arkansas Machine Works, Inc., Defendant D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Arkansas Machine Works, Inc., D & F Equipment Sales, Inc..(Craig, Robert) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Arkansas Machine Works, Inc., D & F Equipment Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Craig, Robert) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Tuff Coat, LLC.(Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 32 Black Diamond Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Leeco Steel, LLC, Nucor Corporation by Black Diamond JA LC, James Jim Tames.(Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Leeco Steel, LLC, re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(2) AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(3); OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) filed by Defendant Leeco Steel, LLC (Slaughter, Edward) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 17, 2021 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Black Diamond JA LC, James Jim Tames, Tuff Coat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Richards, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 17, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Arkansas Machine Works, Inc., D & F Equipment Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Craig, Robert) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. and Arkansas Machine Works, Inc.'s deadline to file a response to the Original Complaint is extended through and including March 31, 2021.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 17, 2021 Reset Answer Deadlines: Black Diamond JA LC answer due 3/31/2021; James Jim Tames answer due 3/31/2021; Tuff Coat, LLC answer due 3/31/2021. (bw) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 17, 2021 Reset Answer Deadlines: Arkansas Machine Works, Inc. answer due 3/31/2021; D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. answer due 3/31/2021. (bw) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Defendants James Jim Tames, Black Diamond JA LC and Tuff Coat LLC's deadline to file their Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended up to and including March 31, 2021.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 15, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch, re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(2) AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(3); OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) filed by Defendant Leeco Steel, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 3, 2021 Filing 27 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Leeco Steel, LLC. (Slaughter, Edward) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(2) AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(3); OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) by Leeco Steel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Affidavit of Lisa Liarakos)(Slaughter, Edward) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Caitlin E. O'Connell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14537084) by on behalf of Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of James F. Bennett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14537058) by on behalf of Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Matthew K. Crane ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14536987) by on behalf of Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 26, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Nucor Corporation answer due 4/16/2021. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Nucor Corporations forgoing Motion for Extension to File Response to Plaintiffs Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Nucor Corporation to file a response to the Complaint is hereby extended through and including Friday, April 16,2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. Tuff Coat, LLC served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. Arkansas Machine Works, Inc. served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Nucor Corporation. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Nucor Corporation(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. Nucor Corporation served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. Leeco Steel, LLC served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. D & F Equipment Sales, Inc. served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Muhammad Suleiman Aziz Matthew M. Marzak ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14484889) by on behalf of James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Muhammad Suleiman Aziz Maverick J. Ray ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14484869) by on behalf of James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Tuff Coat, LLC. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Arkansas Machine Works, Inc.. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Nucor Corporation. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to D & F Equipment Sales, Inc.. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Leeco Steel, LLC. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Black Diamond JA LC. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to James Jim Tames. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Matthew M. Marzak for James Lynch and Shannon Lynch. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Maverick J. Ray for James Lynch and Shannon Lynch. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 8, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 7, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by James Lynch, Shannon Lynch. (Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]
February 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14461576). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Shannon Lynch, James Lynch.(Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from txwd on 10/21/2022.] [Transferred from Arizona on 1/17/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch et al v. Tames et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lynch
Represented By: Matthew M Marzak
Represented By: S. Ranchor Harris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Lynch
Represented By: Matthew M Marzak
Represented By: S. Ranchor Harris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: James Jim Tames doing business as Black Diamond Body Armor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Diamond JA LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leeco Steel LLC
Represented By: Laura Kugler
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&F Equipment Sales Incorporated
Represented By: Keith Alan Olbricht
Represented By: Kenneth J Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Machine Works Incorporated
Represented By: Kenneth J Januszewski
Represented By: Keith Alan Olbricht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuff Coat LLC doing business as Bulley Line NWA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Crane
Represented By: James F Bennett
Represented By: Caitlin O'Connell
Represented By: Fielding E. Huseth
Represented By: Scott M. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?