Needles et al v. Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Plaintiff: Preston Needles and Ian Matson
Defendant: Archer Daniels Midland Company a/k/a ADM Trucking, Inc., Archer-Daniels-Midland Company and ADM Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00325
Filed: June 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/10/2023. (kab)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Stay. The Parties are to report the status of this case on or before August 25, 2023. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/10/2023. (kab)
July 10, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION (JOINT STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER) by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company (Doig, Amy)
July 10, 2023 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay re Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference,,, by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. Responses due by 7/24/2023 (Doig, Amy)
June 29, 2023 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/20/2023. (ams)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Amy Doig for Archer-Daniels-Midland Company (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/12/2023. (kab)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Tia C. Ghattas for Archer-Daniels-Midland Company (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/12/2023. (kab)
June 12, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company.(Renegar, Zachary)
June 7, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amy Doig Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6100369. by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Renegar, Zachary)
June 7, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tia C. Ghattas Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6100359. by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Renegar, Zachary)
June 6, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company - Case Assignment Package Served. (Renegar, Zachary)
June 1, 2023 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mdp)
June 1, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Archer Daniels Midland Company (Renegar, Zachary) Modified docket text on 6/2/2023 (mdp).
June 1, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Archer Daniels Midland Company (Renegar, Zachary) Modified docket text on 6/2/2023 (mdp).
June 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary V. Renegar on behalf of Archer Daniels Midland Company (Renegar, Zachary) Modified docket text on 6/2/2023 (mdp).
June 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 23-CVS-8020. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6093287), filed by Archer Daniels Midland Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint filed in Mecklenburg County Superior Court)(Renegar, Zachary) Modified docket text on 6/2/2023 (mdp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Needles et al v. Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Needles
Represented By: Bryan Nicolas Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Matson
Represented By: Bryan Nicolas Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Daniels Midland Company a/k/a ADM Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary V. Renegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Represented By: Amy Doig
Represented By: Tia C. Ghattas
Represented By: Zachary V. Renegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADM Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Tia C. Ghattas
Represented By: Amy Doig
Represented By: Zachary V. Renegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?