Smarr v. Pelican Health at Charlotte, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patti Rena Smarr
Defendant: Pelican Health at Charlotte, LLC, Accordius Health, LLC, The Portopiccolo Group, LLC, Simcha Hyman and Naftali Zanziper
Case Number: 3:2023cv00345
Filed: June 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. This matter is STAYED until otherwise ordered by the Court. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on October 6, 2023, and every sixty (60) days thereafter, until the arbitration is complete or this matter is otherwise dismissed. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/7/23. (mga) Modified text on 7/7/2023 (mga).
July 7, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/6/2023 (mga)
June 20, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Accordius Health, LLC, Naftali Zanziper, Pelican Health at Charlotte, LLC, Simcha Hyman, The Portopiccolo Group, LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
June 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Accordius Health, LLC, Naftali Zanziper, Pelican Health at Charlotte, LLC, Simcha Hyman, The Portopiccolo Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/5/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Agreement) (Phillips, Michael). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 14, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Accordius Health, LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
June 14, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Pelican Health at Charlotte, LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
June 14, 2023 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by The Portopiccolo Group, LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
June 14, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Simcha Hyman. (Phillips, Michael)
June 14, 2023 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Naftali Zanziper. (Phillips, Michael)
June 12, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Patti Rena Smarr. (Everage, Charles)
June 12, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Portopiccolo Group, LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
June 12, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pelican Health at Charlotte, LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
June 12, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accordius Health, LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
June 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of Mecklenburg County, case number 23-CVS-7819. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6104950), filed by Naftali Zanziper, The Portopiccolo Group, LLC, Accordius Health, LLC, Pelican Health at Charlotte, LLC, Simcha Hyman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Michael)
June 12, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smarr v. Pelican Health at Charlotte, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Rena Smarr
Represented By: Charles A. Everage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelican Health at Charlotte, LLC
Represented By: Michael Earl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accordius Health, LLC
Represented By: Michael Earl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Portopiccolo Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael Earl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simcha Hyman
Represented By: Michael Earl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naftali Zanziper
Represented By: Michael Earl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?