Hull et al v. Pape et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hull and Hull Logistics, LLC
Defendant: Roy Laumont Pape, Sr., ECM Transport, LLC and Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00405
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ECM Transport, LLC, Roy Laumont Pape, Sr, Werner Enterprises, Inc..(Phillips, Anderson)
August 30, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ECM Transport, LLC. (Phillips, Anderson)
August 30, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Anderson)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 5 days. Discovery due by 2/13/2024. Motions due by 3/12/2024. Mediation deadline set for 2/27/2024. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2024 09:01 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/22/23. (clc)
August 10, 2023 Filing 10 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Phillips, Anderson)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. ECM Transport, LLC answer due 9/6/2023; Roy Laumont Pape, Sr answer due 9/6/2023; Werner Enterprises, Inc. answer due 9/6/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/4/23. (mga) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/4/2023) (mga). NEF regenerated on 8/4/2023 (mga).
August 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by ECM Transport, LLC, Roy Laumont Pape, Sr, Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Anderson). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 3, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anderson H. Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Anderson)
August 3, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anderson H. Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Anderson)
July 26, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jonathan Hull, Hull Logistics, LLC. Roy Laumont Pape, Sr served on 7/22/2023, answer due 8/14/2023. (Everage, Charles)
July 21, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jonathan Hull, Hull Logistics, LLC. ECM Transport, LLC served on 7/18/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. (Everage, Charles)
July 10, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jonathan Hull, Hull Logistics, LLC. (Everage, Charles)
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to ECM Transport, LLC, Roy Laumont Pape, Sr, Werner Enterprises, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jm)
July 7, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jm)
July 7, 2023 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (jm)
July 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6134667), filed by Jonathan Hull, Hull Logistics, LLC.(Everage, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hull et al v. Pape et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hull
Represented By: Charles A. Everage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hull Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Everage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Laumont Pape, Sr.
Represented By: Anderson H. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECM Transport, LLC
Represented By: Anderson H. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Anderson H. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?