Contego Spa Designs, Inc. v. Christy Le JL Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs, Inc.
Defendant: Christy Le JL Corporation d/b/a US Nails, Christy Le and Christy Le JL Corporation doing business as US Nails
Counter Defendant: Christy Le JL Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv00533
Filed: August 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 26 AMENDED ANSWER to Original #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Christy Le, Christy Le JL Corporation by Christy Le, Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew)
October 6, 2023 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew)
October 5, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Clement Asante on behalf of Christy Le JL Corporation, Christy Le (Asante, Clement)
October 5, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by LaTasha Mabry Snipes on behalf of Christy Le JL Corporation, Christy Le (Snipes, LaTasha)
October 5, 2023 Filing 22 Joint Notice of Withdrawal of document by Christy Le JL Corporation. *** Documents terminated: #12 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Christy Le JL Corporation filed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc. (Groseclose, Mathew). Modified text on 10/5/2023 (mga).
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Clement Asante for Christy Le JL Corporation,Clement Asante for Christy Le (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/5/23. (mga)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew Frontz for Christy Le JL Corporation,Matthew Frontz for Christy Le (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/5/23. (mga)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added LaTasha Snipes for Christy Le JL Corporation,LaTasha Snipes for Christy Le (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/5/23. (mga)
October 5, 2023 Notice to casante@polsinelli.com: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/12/2023. (mga)
October 5, 2023 Notice to LaTasha Snipes: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/12/2023. (mga)
October 5, 2023 Notice to mfrontz@polsinelli.com: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/12/2023. (mga)
October 4, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Clement Asante Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6246196. by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 4, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Frontz Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6246193. by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 4, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to LaTasha Snipes Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6246191. by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 2, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Christy Le JL Corporation by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew)
September 28, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew Ryan Groseclose on behalf of Christy Le JL Corporation (Groseclose, Mathew)
September 27, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Contego Spa Designs, Inc. by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Groseclose, Mathew)
September 21, 2023 Filing 12 **WITHDRAWN** MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Christy Le JL Corporation by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Placey, Sean) Modified text on 10/5/2023 (mga).
September 11, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. Christy Le JL Corporation served on 8/30/2023, answer due 9/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Placey, Sean)
August 31, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Thomas Placey on behalf of Contego Spa Designs, Inc. (Placey, Sean)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Neal M. Cohen for Contego Spa Designs, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/24/23. (mga)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James K. Sakaguchi for Contego Spa Designs, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/23/23. (mga)
August 24, 2023 Filing 7 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (jm)
August 24, 2023 Notice to Neal M. Cohen: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/31/2023. (mga)
August 24, 2023 Notice to James K. Sakaguchi: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/31/2023. (mga)
August 23, 2023 Filing 6 DELETED DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR.
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James K. Sakaguchi Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6194641. by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Coughlin, Richard). Motions referred to David Keesler. Modified text on 8/24/2023 (jm).
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Neal M. Cohen Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6194607. by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Coughlin, Richard). Motions referred to David Keesler. Modified text on 8/24/2023 (jm).
August 23, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Christy Le JL Corporation , Christy Le. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jm) Modified text on 8/24/2023 (jm).
August 23, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Coughlin, Richard) Modified text on 8/24/2023 (jm).
August 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christy Le JL Corporation , Christy Le with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6194481) , filed by Contego Spa Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Coughlin, Richard) Modified Docket Text on 8/23/2023 (cjs). Modified text on 8/23/2023 (jm). Modified text on 8/24/2023 (jm).
August 23, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jm)
August 23, 2023 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contego Spa Designs, Inc. v. Christy Le JL Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A Coughlin
Represented By: James K. Sakaguchi
Represented By: Neal M. Cohen
Represented By: Sean Thomas Placey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Le JL Corporation d/b/a US Nails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Le
Represented By: Clement Asante
Represented By: Matthew R Frontz
Represented By: LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Represented By: Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Le JL Corporation doing business as US Nails
Represented By: Clement Asante
Represented By: LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Represented By: Matthew R Frontz
Represented By: Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Christy Le JL Corporation
Represented By: Clement Asante
Represented By: LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Represented By: Matthew R Frontz
Represented By: Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?