Anderson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Alesia Anderson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2023cv00657
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Janice Powers on behalf of United States of America (Powers, Janice)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Alesia Anderson. United States of America served on 10/30/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Armstrong, C.)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jm)
October 11, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jm)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6253299), filed by Alesia Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Armstrong, C.) Modified text on 10/13/2023 (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alesia Anderson
Represented By: C. Preston Armstrong, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Janice Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?