Ellis v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Ellis
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00714
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: Susan C Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Deborah Ellis. (Niemeyer, Mark)
November 28, 2023 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Goodheart, Eric)
November 28, 2023 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Goodheart, Eric)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher S McRae for Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 11/13/2023. (brl)
November 15, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher S. McRae Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6294994. by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Goodheart, Eric). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stephen E. Nichols for Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 11/15/2023. (brl)
November 14, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen E. Nichols Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6294253. by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Goodheart, Eric). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mark R Niemeyer for Deborah Ellis (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 11/7/2023. (brl)
November 8, 2023 Notice to Mark R. Niemeyer: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/15/2023. (brl)
November 7, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark R. Niemeyer Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6286206. by Deborah Ellis. (WARD, JAMES). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES L. WARD, Jr on behalf of Deborah Ellis (WARD, JAMES)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Micah L. Hobbs for Sanofi US Services Inc.,Micah L. Hobbs for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 11/6/23. (mga)
November 6, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Micah Hobbs Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6283344. by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Goodheart, Eric). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Goodheart, Eric)
November 6, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Goodheart, Eric)
November 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Steven Goodheart on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Goodheart, Eric)
October 31, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-09347. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
October 31, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
October 31, 2023 Notice to Mark R Niemeyer, Michael S. Kruse, Christopher S McRae, Stephen Evans Nichols: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/7/2023. (rth)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Western District of North Carolina. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/31/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/31/2023.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/31/2023.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/31/2023.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/31/2023.]
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7158910) filed by Deborah Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Mark R. Niemeyer added to party Deborah Ellis(pty:pla).(Niemeyer, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/31/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Stephen E. Nichols
Represented By: Eric Steven Goodheart
Represented By: Micah L. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Stephen E. Nichols
Represented By: Eric Steven Goodheart
Represented By: Micah L. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. Nichols
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Eric Steven Goodheart
Represented By: Micah L. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ellis
Represented By: Mark R Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael S. Kruse
Represented By: JAMES L. WARD, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?