Moore, et al. v. Compass Group USA, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: George Moore, Virginia Carter and James Jilek
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc. doing business as Canteen
Consolidated Plaintiff: Francis Jaye and Sean Madelmayer
Consolidated Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2023cv00818
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
2 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting Plaintiff Jikek's #286 Unopposed Motion for Order Extending Due Date for Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike. Response due within seven (7) days of the Court's ruling on the parties' pending "Joint Motion for Consent Order Re Pending Motions" (Document No. #285 ). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/29/23. (mga)
December 28, 2023 Filing 286 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #262 MOTION to Strike by James Jilek, George Moore. Responses due by 1/11/2024 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jenkins, Michael). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 13, 2023 Filing 285 Joint Motion for Consent Order re #257 -1 Plaintiff's Pending Motions for Class Certification; #262 Defendant's Motion to Strike by James Jilek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order)(Ramey, Martin) Modified text to change event to a motion and removed referral on 12/14/2023 (mga).
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting #282 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kenn Brotman for Compass Group USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/13/23. (mga)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: #262 MOTION to Strike . Responses due by 12/29/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/13/23. (mga)
December 13, 2023 Filing 282 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kenn Brotman Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6329178. by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (McClurg, Daniel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 13, 2023 Notice to Kenn Brotman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 12/20/2023. (mga)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #275 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Paul W. Sweeney, Jr for Compass Group USA, Inc.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2023. (mga) Modified judge's signature date on 12/15/2023 (mek).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #274 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joseph C. Wylie, II for Compass Group USA, Inc.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2023. (mga) Modified judge's signature date on 12/15/2023 (mek).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting #273 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Nicole C Mueller for Compass Group USA, Inc. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2023. (mga) Modified to text to show Nicole C Mueller added for Compass Group USA, Inc on 12/11/2023 (mga). Modified judge's signature date on 12/15/2023 (mek).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #270 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Richard S. Cornfeld for James Jilek. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2023. (mga) Modified judge's signature date on 12/15/2023 (mek).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #269 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michel M. Arias for James Jilek (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2023. (mga) Modified judge's signature date on 12/15/2023 (mek).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #268 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael Anthony Jenkins for James Jilek. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2023. (mga) Modified judge's signature date on 12/15/2023 (mek).
December 11, 2023 Notice to Mickel M. Arias: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 12/18/2023. (mga)
December 8, 2023 Filing 275 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul W. Sweeney, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6324747. by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (McClurg, Daniel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 8, 2023 Filing 274 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph C. Wylie, II Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6324746. by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (McClurg, Daniel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 8, 2023 Filing 273 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nicole C. Mueller Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6324731. by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (McClurg, Daniel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 8, 2023 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Drew McClurg on behalf of Compass Group USA, Inc. (McClurg, Daniel)
December 8, 2023 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla Tun Reschly on behalf of Compass Group USA, Inc. (Reschly, Marla)
December 7, 2023 Filing 270 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard S. Cornfeld Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6323085. by James Jilek. (Rhine, Joel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 7, 2023 Filing 269 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mickel M. Arias Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6323080. by James Jilek. (Rhine, Joel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 7, 2023 Filing 268 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Anthony Jenkins Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6323079. by James Jilek. (Rhine, Joel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's #256 Motion to Seal Document No. 257. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/7/23. (mga) (Main Document 267 replaced on 12/7/2023) (mga).
December 7, 2023 Motion referred to David Keesler.: #256 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #262 MOTION to Strike (mdp)
December 5, 2023 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel R. Rhine on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rhine, Joel) (Main Document 266 replaced on 12/6/2023) (mdp).
December 5, 2023 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin A. Ramey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ramey, Martin) (Main Document 265 replaced on 12/6/2023) (mdp).
December 4, 2023 Case reassigned to Senior Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. District Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 264 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01962. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
December 1, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David Keesler: #256 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #262 MOTION to Strike This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
December 1, 2023 Notice to Elise R Sanguinetti, Michael Anthony Jenkins, Mickel M. Arias, Richard S. Cornfeld, Daniel Scott Levy, Christina N Goodrich, Joseph C. Wylie, Kathryn G Hummel Kenn Brotman, Nicole C Mueller, Paul W. Sweeney: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 12/8/2023. (rth)
December 1, 2023 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (rth)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' consent motions to consolidate, Docs. #228 , #231 , are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Baldwin v. Compass Group USA, Inc., No. 4:23-cv- 00568-JAR, and Borrero v. Compass Group USA, Inc., No. 4:23-cv-00586-RLW, are consolidated with Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc., No. 4:18-cv-01962-SEP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that henceforth all pleading and other documents in Baldwin and Borrero shall be filed in Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc., No. 4:18-cv-01962- SEP. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 4.03 ("Following consolidation, all documents shall be filed only in the lowest-numbered case[.]"). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines in Baldwin and Borrero are vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Jaye et al. v. Crane Merchandising Systems Inc et al., No. 4:20-cv-00266-SEP, is deconsolidated from Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc., No. 4:18-cv-01962-SEP, and DISMISSED without prejudice. See Doc. #239 at 20. A separate Order of Dismissal accompanies this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer this case and the consolidated cases, Jilek v. Compass Group USA, Inc. et al., No. 4:19-cv-03335- SEP, Baldwin v. Compass Group USA, Inc., No. 4:23-cv-00568-SEP, and Borrero v. Compass Group USA, Inc., No. 4:23-cv-00586-SEP, to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Jilek's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Court Order of June 15, 2023, Doc. #249 , is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, Doc. #250 , is DENIED without prejudice to refiling in light of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/15/2023. (KXS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 10, 2023 Filing 262 MOTION to Strike by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 10, 2023 Filing 261 DECLARATION filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. re #260 Response to Motion, (Declaration of Nicole C. Mueller). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Mueller, Nicole) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 10, 2023 Filing 260 RESPONSE to Motion re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal (Compass Group USA, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to #257 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification) filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #258 MOTION to Withdraw by Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) filed by George Moore, James Jilek ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/25/2023. (Attorney Robert Merrill Partain and Alfredo Torrijos terminated.)(ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 24, 2023 Filing 258 MOTION to Withdraw by Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 13, 2023 Filing 257 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff James Jilek. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 13, 2023 Filing 256 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff James Jilek. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 15, 2023 Filing 255 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff George Moore re #254 Reply to Response to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Amended Complaint Exhibit A, #4 Amended Complaint Exhibit B, #5 Amended Complaint Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit 3)(Jenkins, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 15, 2023 Filing 254 REPLY to Response to Motion re #250 MOTION for Leave to Amend filed by Plaintiff George Moore. (Jenkins, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Filing 253 RESPONSE in Opposition re #250 MOTION for Leave to Amend filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 252 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff George Moore re #250 MOTION for Leave to Amend . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Jenkins, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 251 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #250 MOTION for Leave to Amend filed by Plaintiff George Moore. (Jenkins, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 250 MOTION for Leave to Amend by Plaintiff George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 249 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Court's Order of June 15 2023 -FINAL by Plaintiff James Jilek. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Document)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Filing 248 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Compass' Brief On Whether To Transfer Jilek re #241 Response to Court Order by Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #244 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice M. Anthony Jenkins. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10024330) by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore. (Jenkins, Michael) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/30/2023. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #243 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mike Arias. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached, by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore. (Arias, Mickel); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/30/2023. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Response, Doc. #242 , is GRANTED. No further briefing will be permitted regarding the issue of transfer as set out at the hearing on June 15, 2023, see Doc. 236 . Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/30/2023. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 29, 2023 Filing 244 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice M. Anthony Jenkins. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10024330) by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Exhibit A)(Jenkins, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 29, 2023 Filing 243 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mike Arias. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10024315) by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Exhibit A)(Arias, Mickel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 28, 2023 Filing 242 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Compass' Brief on Whether to Transfer Jilek by Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 241 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 240 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 239 TRANSCRIPT of 236 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on JUNE 15, 2023 before Judge Pitlyk. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/14/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2023. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 238 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 236 (STATUS CONFERENCE) by James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) (Emailed to Lisa Paczkowski on 6/23/2023 (NEP).) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 20, 2023 Filing 237 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 236 (MOTION HEARING) by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Mueller, Nicole) (Emailed to Lisa Paczkowski on 6/22/2023 (NEP).) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 15, 2023 Filing 236 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Status Conference held on 6/15/2023. The Court denied the parties' Consent Motion to Extend Schedule, Doc. 232, and dismissed as moot Jaye et al v. Crane Merchandising Systems Inc. et al., No. 4:20-cv-00266-SEP, with the consent of the parties. The Court ordered the parties to brief, in no longer than five pages per party, the following issues to be submitted to the Court no later than June 23, 2023: (1) why Moore, et al. v. Compass Group USA, Inc., et al., 4:18-cv-01962-SEP, should not be dismissed as moot in light of George Moore's pending withdrawal as a lead plaintiff in this case; and (2) why, upon the dismissal of Jaye et al v. Crane Merchandising Systems Inc. et al., and Moore, et al. v. Compass Group USA, Inc., et al., the remaining member case, James Jilek v. Compass Group USA, Inc. et al., No. 4:19-cv-03335-SEP, should not be transferred to the Central District of California under this Court's authority pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Further details set forth on the oral record from today's hearing. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985) (proceedings started: 1:12 p.m.) (proceedings ended: 1:45 p.m.) (Deputy Clerk: K. Kratzer)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Robert Partain (appears by phone) and Dan Levy)(Appearance for Defendant: Joseph Wylie) Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01962-SEP, 4:19-cv-03335-SEP, 4:20-cv-00266-SEP(KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #234 MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely at the June 15, 2023 Status Conference by Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Levy, Daniel) filed by George Moore, James Jilek; ORDERED GRANTED. Counsel will be emailed instructions on how to appear via telephone. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 6/14/2023. (KEK) Modified on 6/14/2023 (KEK). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 13, 2023 Filing 234 MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely at the June 15, 2023 Status Conference by Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Levy, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Conference in this matter is set for Thursday, June 15, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 16-North. [THIS HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE IN PERSON AT THE THOMAS F. EAGLETON COURTHOUSE] Status Conference set for 6/15/2023 01:00 PM in Courtroom 16N - St. Louis before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 6/13/2023. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 5, 2023 Filing 232 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Schedule by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 30, 2023 Filing 231 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:23-cv-586-SRW by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 25, 2023 Filing 230 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT Neutral: Musgrave, John R.. Date of Conference: 5/25/2023. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 4, 2023 Filing 229 TRANSCRIPT of 226 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 05/01/2023 before Judge District Judge Sarah Pitlyk. Court Reporter/Transcriber Reagan Fiorino, Reagan_Fiorino@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7989. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Redaction Request due 5/25/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2023.)(KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 2, 2023 Filing 228 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Case No. 4:23-cv-00568-JAR by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 1, 2023 Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 226 (TELEPHONE CONFERENCE) by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Mueller, Nicole) (Request forwarded to Court Reporter R. Fiorino on 5/3/2023.) (CBL). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 1, 2023 Filing 226 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Hearing held on May 1, 2023 re #219 Motion for Hearing by Telephone and Order Compelling Deposition, #223 Motion to Dismiss Party with Prejudice Francis Jaye, and #212 Motion to Quash Deposition of Virginia Carter. The Court clarified the scope of the previously ordered deposition of David Goldring, the details of which are set forth on the oral record from the hearing today. The Court granted the motion to dismiss Francis Jaye with prejudice #223 . The Court denied the motion to quash the deposition of Virginia Carter #212 . (Court Reporter:Reagan Fiorino, Reagan_Fiorino@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7989) (proceedings started: 2:12) (proceedings ended: 2:28) (Deputy Clerk: K. Zenon)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Robert Partain and Anthony Jenkins)(Appearance for Defendant: Joseph Wylie) (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 28, 2023 Filing 225 RESPONSE to Motion re #223 MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice Frances Jaye filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant must respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Party with Prejudice, Doc. [ #223 ], and specifically state whether it consents to or opposes the dismissal no later than April 28, 2023, by the end of the day. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/27/2023. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 26, 2023 Filing 223 MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice Frances Jaye by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Francis Jaye, Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Docket Text ORDER: At the request of the parties, the Status Conference in this matter is reset for May 1, 2023, at 2:00 PM via Zoom. This is a TIME CHANGE ONLY and Zoom instructions were previously sent to counsel. (Status Conference set for 5/1/2023 02:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/25/2023. (AFO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #219 MOTION for Hearing by Telephone and Order Compelling Deposition by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Francis Jaye, Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) filed by George Moore, Francis Jaye, James Jilek ; ORDERED GRANTED. A Status Conference is set for 5/1/2023 at 03:00 PM via Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (The parties will be emailed Zoom information.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/24/2023. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 21, 2023 Filing 220 REPLY to Response to Motion re #212 MOTION to Quash Deposition of Virginia Carter filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Francis Jaye, Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 21, 2023 Filing 219 MOTION for Hearing by Telephone and Order Compelling Deposition by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Francis Jaye, Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 18, 2023 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Musgrave, John R. Neutral selected by parties. [A COPY SENT TO SELECTED NEUTRAL THIS DATE](KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 18, 2023 Filing 217 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore Neutral: Musgrave, John R. Date of Conference: 5/25/2023 time: 9:30 a.m. Location: Lexitas(KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Third Amended Designation of Neutral/ADR Conference Report and for Leave to File Out of Time, Doc. #215 , which the Court construes as a motion for leave to file out of time, is GRANTED because it provides good cause and excusable neglect for Plaintiff's failure to act. Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(B). Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/18/2023. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 17, 2023 Filing 215 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Third Amended Designation of Neutral/ADR Conference Report and for Leave to File Out of Time ;Extension to file the following: Designation of Neutral/ADR Conference Report ;Proposed extension date 04/17/2023 by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Francis Jaye, Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 17, 2023 Filing 214 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance to Review of case shows the Designation of Neutral/ADR conference report has not been filed and was due on or before 4/16/2023. A written motion requesting an extension of the designation of neutral/ADR conference report filing deadline must be filed with the court within 5 days. Notice only, no.pdf attached.(KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 11, 2023 Filing 213 RESPONSE to Motion re #212 MOTION to Quash Deposition of Virginia Carter filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Filing 212 MOTION to Quash Deposition of Virginia Carter by Plaintiff George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 207 (DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) by George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) (Emailed to Kris Toennies on 3/31/2023 (NEP).) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT of 207 (Discovery Hearing) held on 3/24/2023 before Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kristine Toennies, Kristine_Toennies@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-6701. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2023. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 27, 2023 Filing 209 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 207 (Discovery Hearing) by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) (Sent to Kristine Toennies on 3/29/2023 (NEP).) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is referred to mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Elise R. Sanguinetti. ADR Completion Deadline due by 5/26/2023. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 6/9/2023. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 4/16/2023. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/27/2023. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 24, 2023 Filing 207 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Discovery Hearing held on 3/24/2023. Discussion held regarding the issue of deposing former plaintiff's Madelmayer and Carter. The deposition of Madelmayer is not to be conducted. The deposition of Carter is permitted but is not to last longer than 3 hours. Parties permitted to challenge this ruling with the filing of a Motion to Quash. (Court Reporter:Kristine Toennies, Kristine_Toennies@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-6701) (proceedings started: 2:37 p.m.) (proceedings ended: 3:20 p.m.) (Deputy Clerk: K. Kratzer)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Richard Cornfeld)(Appearance for Defendant: Joseph Wylie) (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #205 MEMORANDUM Request for Telephone Conference with the Court by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Francis Jaye, Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) Modified on 3/13/2023 - changed to motion (ANP). filed by George Moore, Francis Jaye, James Jilek ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Discovery Hearing set for 3/24/2023 at 02:30 PM via Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Parties to receive Zoom information by separate email. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 03/13/2023. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 10, 2023 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM Request for Telephone Conference with the Court by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Francis Jaye, Plaintiffs James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) Modified on 3/13/2023 - changed to motion (ANP). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Docket Text ORDER RE: #201 SUPPLEMENTAL re 126 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/3/2023. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation of Dismissal, Doc. [ #202 ], is SO ORDERED. The Court directs the Clerk to terminate Virginia Carter and Sean Madelmayer as parties to this case. (Virginia Carter and Sean Madelmayer terminated.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/3/2023. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Filing 202 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiffs Virginia Carter's and Sean Madelmayer's Cases by Plaintiff George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Filing 201 SUPPLEMENTAL re 126 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Musgrave, John R. Neutral selected by Parties (Copy emailed to neutral this date.)(ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Filing 199 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff George Moore Neutral: Musgrave, John R. Date of Conference: 4/5/23 time: 9:30 a.m. Location: Lexitas(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 198 FOURTH AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 3: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (Discovery Completion due by 9/22/2023. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2023. ADR Future Reference 3/27/2023. ADR Completion Deadline due by 5/26/2023. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 6/9/2023.) [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/12/2023. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Doc. #191 , is GRANTED IN PART and counts 14 and 15 of the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Extend Alternative Dispute Resolution Completion Deadline, Doc. #189 , and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery Schedule, Doc. #196 , are GRANTED. A Fourth Amended Case Management Order accompanies this Order. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/12/2023. (KEK) Modified on 1/12/2023 (KEK). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 196 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Third Amended Case Management Order and Proposed Fourth Amended Case Management Order by Plaintiff George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Attachment [Proposed] Order)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 195 REPLY to Response to Motion re #191 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts XIV and XV of Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Prejudice filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 23, 2022 Filing 194 RESPONSE to Motion re #191 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts XIV and XV of Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 193 ANSWER to 126 Amended Complaint, (Compass Group USA, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Compass Group USA, Inc..(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #191 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts XIV and XV of Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Prejudice filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 191 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts XIV and XV of Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Prejudice by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 190 RESPONSE to Motion re #189 MOTION for Extension of: Alternative Dispute Resolution Completion Deadline filed by Plaintiff George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 189 MOTION for Extension of: Alternative Dispute Resolution Completion Deadline by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #187 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 126 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendant must answer the Amended Complaint no later than November 14, 2022. (Compass Group USA, Inc. answer due 11/14/2022.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/8/2022. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 126 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #185 MOTION to Withdraw #183 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT TO AGREE ON A DATE FOR MEDIATION by Plaintiff George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) filed by George Moore; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/3/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 185 MOTION to Withdraw #183 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT TO AGREE ON A DATE FOR MEDIATION by Plaintiff George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 184 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff George Moore Neutral: Musgrave, John R. Date of Conference: 12/12/22 time: 9:30 a.m. Location: Lexitas(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 183 {WITHDRAWN} MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT TO AGREE ON A DATE FOR MEDIATION by Plaintiff George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cornfeld, Richard) Modified on 11/3/2022 (KEK). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Musgrave, John R. Neutral selected by parties. [A COPY FORWARDED TO SELECTED NEUTRAL THIS DATE](KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 181 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff George Moore Neutral: Musgrave, John R. Date of Conference: To be designated; Defendant is not yet able to select a date.(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Elise Sanguinetti ADR Completion Deadline due by 12/12/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 12/26/2022. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 10/31/2022. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/11/2022. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is referred to mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Elise R. Sanguinetti. ADR Completion Deadline due by 12/12/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 12/26/2022. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 10/31/2022. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/11/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims in the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, Doc. 126, predicated on Defendants single-price labeled machines are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 09/30/2022. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Doc. #134 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to I.B of this Order. All claims predicated on Defendants single-price labeled machines are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the alternative relief requested in the Motion is GRANTED with respect to IV.B of this Order. Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint, in accordance with the instructions provided above, see supra Section IV.B, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. In all other respects, the Motion is DENIED. ( Response to Court due by 10/21/2022.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 09/30/2022. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #175 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ; attorney/firm Pam K. Sran by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. (Sran, Pam) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Pam K. Sran terminated. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 9/14/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 14, 2022 Filing 175 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Pam K. Sran by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Sran, Pam) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 3: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track 3. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Discovery Completion due by 5/19/2023. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 5/29/2023. ADR Future Reference 10/3/2022. ADR Completion Deadline due by 12/12/2022. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 6/13/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 10, 2022 Filing 173 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Joint Motion to Amended The Second Amended Case Management Order and Joint Proposed Amended Scheduling Plan) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Status Conference set for 6/1/2022 is moved up to 01:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. This is a time-change ONLY. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 05/16/2022. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to compel, Doc. #157 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted as to the redacted columns of document CG-0019044, which Defendant shall produce subject to the parties protective order. The motion is denied as to documents CG-0021734 and CG-0021955, which are protected by attorney-client privilege. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 05/10/2022. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 9, 2022 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT of 167 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 05/04/2022 before Judge District Judge Sarah Pitlyk. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kristine Toennies, Kristine_Toennies@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7900. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2022. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for 6/1/2022 at 02:00 PM via Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Parties to receive Zoom information by a separate email. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 05/06/2022. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 5, 2022 Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 167 by Compass Group USA, Inc. before Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 4, 2022 Filing 167 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Status Conference held on 5/4/2022 via Zoom. Case status/ discovery discussed on the record. (Court Reporter:Kristine Toennies, Kristine_Toennies@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7900) (proceedings started: 11:50) (proceedings ended: 12:50) (Deputy Clerk: NEP)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Robert Partain, Daniel Levy, & Rick Cornfeld)(Appearance for Defendant: Joe Wylie & Nicole Mueller) (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Discovery Hearing is RESET for 5/4/2022 11:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. The zoom login information previously sent remains the same. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/30/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #164 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicole C. Mueller. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9254903) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Mueller, Nicole) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/26/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 164 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicole C. Mueller. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9254903) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mueller, Nicole) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Continue, Doc. #162 , is GRANTED. The discovery conference is reset for Monday, May 2, 2022, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. Parties to receive Zoom information by a separate email. ( Discovery Hearing set for 5/2/2022 09:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 04/22/2022. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 21, 2022 Filing 162 Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Conference by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a discovery conference is set for Wednesday, April 27, 2022, at 12:00 PM by Zoom. The parties will receive the Zoom information by separate email. The parties should be prepared to argue the issues raised in Doc. #157 and Doc. #159 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall produce the documents identified in Doc. #157 as CG-0019044, CG-0021734, and CG-0021955 to the Court for in camera review by Friday, April 22, 2022. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, on consent of both parties, the deadline for Plaintiffs to disclose expert witnesses is extended to May 13, 2022. The parties shall provide proposed extensions to the remaining expert disclosure deadlines at the April 27th hearing. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 04/20/2022. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 160 RESPONSE to Motion re #159 MOTION for Discovery Conference and Order Compelling Deposition filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 159 MOTION for Discovery Conference and Order Compelling Deposition by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, Doc. #153 , and Exhibits 2, 4, 6, and 8, Docs. [153-2], [153-4], [153-6], [153-8], shall be UNSEALED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Continued Sealing, Doc. #156 , is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED with respect to Exhibit 1 but DENIED with respect to Exhibits 3, 5, and 7. Doc. [153-1] shall remain SEALED. Docs. [153-3], [153-5], and [153-7] shall be UNSEALED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is STAYED for a period of fourteen (14) days, during which time Defendant may file an appeal of this Order or, on agreement of both parties, withdraw all or part of the provisionally sealed material. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 13.05(A)(4)(g). IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, if no such action is taken within fourteen (14) days, this Order shall take immediate effect, and Docs. [153-3], [153-5], and [153-7] shall be unsealed. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/11/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 21, 2022 Filing 157 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF ALLEGEDLY PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 156 MOTION to Continue SEALING OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ALLEGEDLY PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 155 RESPONSE to Motion re #153 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ALLEGEDLY PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Canteen CEO, Peter Fetherston, shall appear in response to Plaintiffs' deposition notice within twenty-one (21) days, at a date and time convenient for all parties. The deposition shall be limited to two (2) hours on the record and to questions relating to Canteen's decision to conduct the survey and Mr. Fetherston's role in that decision-making process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions to be determined by the Court. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 02/14/2022. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 153 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ALLEGEDLY PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any motion to compel and accompanying exhibits filed pursuant to 151 may be filed provisionally under seal. Both parties shall have 10 days from the date of such motion to file a motion to continue sealing such materials and a memorandum in support thereof, in compliance with Local Rule 13.05. If no party files a motion to continue sealing, the motion to compel and accompanying exhibits filed pursuant to 151 will be unsealed 21 days after the date of filing. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/10/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation [ #149 ], treated as a motion for extension of time, is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a Motion to Compel the production of any or all of the Disputed Documents is February 10, 2022. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/10/2022. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 8, 2022 Filing 150 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 148 Docket Text Order with Schedules, by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION and Order by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation [ #147 ], treated as a motion for extension of time, is GRANTED. The parties shall file their joint submission on February 8, 2022. (Response to Court due by 2/8/2022.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/26/2022. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 24, 2022 Filing 147 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation and Order) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 3 Motion to Join Parties due by 3/4/2022. Discovery Completion due by 8/26/2022. (see full order for details.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 01/18/2022. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 18, 2022 Filing 145 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Discovery Hearing/Status Conference held on 1/18/2022. Defendant shall file a "motion to stay" by 01/28/2022. Plaintiff will have until 02/07/2022 to file a response. Both parties should file an joint statement by 02/04/2022. Amended CMO to issue.(Court Reporter:Carla Klaustermeier, Carla_Klaustermeier@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7984) (proceedings started: 1:01) (proceedings ended: 1:59) (Deputy Clerk: Kayla Zenon)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Robert Partian and Richard Cornfeld)(Appearance for Defendant: Joseph Wylie) (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 144 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. . (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing Date #141 is GRANTED. The discovery conference is rescheduled for Tuesday, January 18, 2022, at 12:30 pm. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a motion to amend the First Amended Case Management Order #87 with a proposed Joint Scheduling Plan attached no later than January 14, 2022. (Discovery Hearing set for 1/18/2022 12:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk., Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/14/2022.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/20/2021. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 17, 2021 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #134 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiffs Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Reply Memorandum) filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 16, 2021 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing Date by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a discovery conference is set for Friday, January 7, 2022, at 2 p.m. by Zoom. Parties will receive the Zoom information by separate email. (Discovery Hearing set for 1/7/2022 02:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/06/2021. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 3, 2021 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #134 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiffs Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #136 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #134 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiffs Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer.; DENIED. No further extensions will be granted for briefing of the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 134). The current briefing schedule already allows extra time to both parties, and any further extension will result in undue delay. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/24/2021. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 22, 2021 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #136 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #134 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiffs Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 19, 2021 Filing 136 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #134 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiffs Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 135 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #134 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiffs Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiffs Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 133 Joint MOTION for Discovery Conference by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #131 MOTION for Leave to File Briefs in Excess of Page Limit by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/12/2021. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File Briefs in Excess of Page Limit by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's previous ORDER 129 is amended as follows: Defendants responsive pleading or motion is due by 11/12/2021, Plaintiff's response to any motion filed by Defendant is due 12/3/2021, and Defendant's reply is due 12/17/2021. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/26/21. (ARL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Extension of Time #127 to respond to the Amended Complaint 126 is GRANTED in part. Defendants responsive pleading or motion is due by 11/12/2021. If necessary, in accordance with E.D. Mo. L.R. 4.01, Plaintiffs response to Defendants motion will be due 11/26/2021, and Defendants reply will be due 12/6/2021. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/21/2021. (KRZ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 19, 2021 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #127 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Francis Jaye. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 127 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #106 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/13/2021. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 SEALED MOTION filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Documents Previously Produced by Defendant), #2 Exhibit 2 (8-31-2020 Email Chain), #3 Exhibit 3 (11-2-2020 Email Chain), #4 Exhibit 4 (4-27-2021 Email Chain))(Torrijos, Alfredo) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 SEALED MOTION filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (8-31-2020 Email Chain), #3 Exhibit 3 (11-2-2020 Email Chain), #4 Exhibit 4 (4-27-2021 Email Chain))(Torrijos, Alfredo) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #121 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #106 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) filed by Virginia Carter, Sean Madelmayer, George Moore, Francis Jaye, James Jilek ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 09/02/2021. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 121 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #106 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 30, 2021 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #106 SEALED MOTION filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 119 Joint MOTION for Discovery Conference by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re #107 SEALED MOTION filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) Modified on 8/18/2021 - changed document this reply is linked to (ANP). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #115 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. (Wylie, Joseph) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/13/2021. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 116 RESPONSE to Motion re #115 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #106 SEALED MOTION filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 113 REDACTION to #106 SEALED MOTION (Drafted by Plaintiff) by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 1 to Plaintiff Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint a copy pf the Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. A to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. B to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. C to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 112 REDACTION to #108 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Docket Text ORDER: ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Doc. #107 , is GRANTED. The parties shall file under seal the materials related to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. #106 ) which refer to the confidential information identified in Defendant's Memorandum in Support (Doc. #108 ). Appropriately redacted copies shall be filed to the public docket according to E.D.Mo. L.R. 13.05. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 08/09/2021. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 5, 2021 Filing 110 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance. Review of this case shows that the Redacted Document or Sealed Memo Re: Inability to File Redacted Document, has not yet been filed in violation of Local Rule 13.05. You have 3 days to comply with the requirements of Local Rule 13.05 or your sealed document may be stricken from the record. Please refer to the # Guidance on Filing Sealed Materials for Filers.pdf for further instructions. Redacted Copy due by 8/9/2021. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 109 SEALED DOCUMENT re #108 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, for Plaintiffs to File Their Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 108 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of #107 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal For Plaintiffs to File Their Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. Redacted Copy due by 8/5/2021. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal For Plaintiffs to File Their Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 106 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Hearing (doc. #104 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set for Monday, July 26, 2021, at 4:30 p.m. by telephone. The call-in number is (877) 873-8017, the access code is 8007905. (Status Conference set for 7/26/2021 04:30 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 07/20/2021. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 104 Joint MOTION for Hearing for Status Conference by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert M. Partain. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8687688) by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Partain, Robert) filed by Virginia Carter, George Moore ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 06/10/2021. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert M. Partain. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8687688) by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Partain, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #99 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pam K. Sran. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8677191) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Pam K. Sran)(Sran, Pam) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 6/3/21. (ARL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenn Brotman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8676133) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Kenn Brotman)(Brotman, Kenn) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 6/3/21. (ARL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pam K. Sran. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8677191) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Pam K. Sran)(Sran, Pam) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenn Brotman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8676133) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Kenn Brotman)(Brotman, Kenn) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 97 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Compass Group USA, Inc..(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 96 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT Neutral: Price, Jr., William Ray. Date of Conference: 5/19/2021. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #94 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Unopposed) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/7/2021. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 94 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Unopposed) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Price, William Ray Neutral selected by parties. [A COPY FORWARDED TO SELECTED NEUTRAL THIS DATE](KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 92 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, James Jilek, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Francis Jaye Neutral: Price, William Ray Date of Conference: 5/19/2021 time: 9:00 a.m. Location: Zoom Meeting(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 91 PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. Amendment to #15 Amended Complaint, Jury Demand, filed by Francis Jaye, George Moore, Virginia Carter, Sean Madelmayer, James Jilek. Related document: #15 Amended Complaint, filed by Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #88 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Complaint by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Cornfeld, Richard) filed by Virginia Carter, Sean Madelmayer, George Moore, Francis Jaye ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 04/06/2021. (ANP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is referred to: mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Richard S. Cornfeld. ADR Completion Deadline due by 6/6/2021. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 6/21/2021. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 4/26/2021. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/6/2021. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 88 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Complaint by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore, Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Francis Jaye, Sean Madelmayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER motion is 3/8/21 This case is assigned to Track: Track 3 - Class Action. Motion to Join Parties due by 4/1/2021. Discovery Completion due by 10/15/2021. ADR Future Reference 4/2/2021. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/8/21. (ARL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 86 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. . (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a new Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan no later than March 5, 2021. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/5/2021.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/22/2021. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #83 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ; attorney/firm Andrew J. Scavotto by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. (Scavotto, Andrew) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Attorney Andrew J. Scavotto terminated. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/4/2021. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 83 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Andrew J. Scavotto by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 82 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT Neutral: Price Jr., William Ray. Date of Conference: 2/3/2021. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement. Although settlement was not reached at this time, the parties may continue discussions at a later time. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Status Conference set for 02/01/2021 is VACATED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/28/2021. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs George Moore, Virginia Carter, and James Jilek's Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel (Doc. [ #68 ]) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Law Office of Richard S. Cornfeld, LLC, and Arias Sanguinetti Wang & Torrijos, LLP, are appointed as interim class counsel. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/8/2020. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Price, William Ray Neutral selected by parties [A COPY FORWARDED TO SELECTED NEUTRAL THIS DATE](KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ; attorney/firm Jaclyn N. Warr by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. (Warr, Jaclyn) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Jaclyn Niccole Warr terminated.Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/23/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Docket Text ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order to Show Cause, Doc. #72 , and in consideration of Defendants response, Doc. #75 , the Court declines to impose monetary sanctions against Defendant or its attorneys at this time but reassigns responsibility for compliance with this Court's ADR Referral Order (Doc. #64 ) from Richard S. Cornfeld to Joseph Wylie. The Court cautions Defendant's counsel that it will consider a motion for further extension of the ADR deadline only if it is timely and shows good cause. See E.D.Mo. L.R. 1.05. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/23/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 11, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Jaclyn N. Warr by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Warr, Jaclyn) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 75 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #72 Order,, by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 74 STATUS REPORT REGARDING COURT ORDERED ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION by Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 73 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore Neutral: Price, William Ray Date of Conference: 2/3/2020 time: 9:30 a.m. Location: Armstrong Teasdale (or video conference)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re #71 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension (Doc. #71 ) is GRANTED. The Court will grant the parties until Monday, November 2, 2020, to comply with Section (d)(2) of the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution (Doc. #64 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall show cause in writing why monetary sanctions should not be imposed against them or their attorneys for failure to comply with the Courts order referring the case to alternative dispute resolution. Defendants shall submit such writing by November 6, 2020. (Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2020.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/30/20. (ARL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL/ADR CONFERENCE REPORT FILING DEADLINE ;Proposed extension date 11/1/20 by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 70 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance to Review of case shows the Designation of Neutral/ADR conference report has not been filed and was due on or before 10/21/2020. A written motion requesting an extension of the designation of neutral/ADR conference report filing deadline must be filed with the court within 5 days. Notice only, no.pdf attached.(KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 28, 2020 ***REMARK: Contacted all counsel this date regarding only filing documents in the lead date. Entries not to be spread to consolidated cases. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #68 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Interim Class Counsel names:Richard S. Cornfeld; Alfredo Torrijos filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Richard S. Cornfeld, #2 Attachment Declaration of Alfredo Torrijos, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Interim Class Counsel names:Richard S. Cornfeld; Alfredo Torrijos by Plaintiffs James Jilek, Virginia Carter, George Moore. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01962-SEP, 4:19-cv-03335-SEP, 4:20-cv-00266-SEP(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Docket Text ORDER: Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) docket entry 29 in 19-cv-03335-SEP docket ORDERED DENIED as moot. Following a ruling on any motions pursuant to Rule 23(g) in Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc., 18-cv-01962-SEP, the Court will order Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint in that cause. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 9/24/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 65 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Designation of Neutral/Conference Report, by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 65 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance to Review of case shows the Designation of Neutral/ADR conference report has not been filed and was due on or before 9/20/2020. A written motion requesting an extension of the designation of neutral/ADR conference report filing deadline must be filed with the court within 5 days. Notice only, no.pdf attached.(KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is referred to: mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Richard S. Cornfeld. ADR Completion Deadline due by 11/18/2020. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 12/2/2020. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 9/20/2020. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/31/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to consolidate the actions (Doc. [ #59 ]) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Jaye v. Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc., et al., Case No. 4:20-cv-00266-RLW is consolidated with Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc., Case No. 4:18-cv-01962-SEP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that henceforth all pleading and other documents in this matter shall be filed in Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc., Case No. 4:18- cv-01962-SEP. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 4.03 (Following consolidation, all documents shall be filed only in the lowest-numbered case[.]). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines set forth in the current Case Management Order (Doc. [ #58 ]) are vacated. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that any party wishing to be appointed interim class counsel for the putative class pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3) shall submit a motion by no later than September 25, 2020. After ruling on any such motion, the Court will establish deadlines for the filing of an amended complaint and a joint scheduling plan. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/31/2020. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Docket Text ORDER: ADR Future Reference reset for 8/3/2020. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 7/10/20. (ARL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re #59 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:20-cv-00266-RLW filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Docket Text ORDER: ADR Future Reference reset for7/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 7/6/20. (ARL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:20-cv-00266-RLW by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 3 Discovery Completion due by 2/15/2021. ADR Future Reference 7/6/2020. Status Conference set for 2/1/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N - St. Louis before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/19/2020. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 57 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. . (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Consent Motion to Consolidate #48 isGRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Jilek v. Compass Group USA, Inc., Case No. 4:19-cv- 03335-SNLJ is consolidated with Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc., Case No. 4:18-cv-01962-SEP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that henceforth all pleading and other documents in this matter shall be filed in Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc., Case No. 4:18-cv-01962-SEP. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 4.03 (Following consolidation, all documents shall be filed only in the lowestnumberedcase[.]). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines set forth in the current Case Management Order #23 are vacated, and that the parties shall submit a new proposed Joint Scheduling Plan by no later than May 12, 2020, and a Rule 16 conference is scheduled for May 19, 2020, at 2:00 PM CT. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation #51 is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/16/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 55 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Telephone Conference held on 4/16/2020. Parties present for hearing on joint motion to consolidate #48 , arguments heard. For the reasons stated on the record the motion is ORDERED GRANTED. Order to issue. Additionally the court enters the following deadlines: Joint Scheduling plan due May 12th, 2020, and Rule 16 Conference set for May 19th, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. (Court Reporter:Laura Esposito, Laura_Esposito@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7739) (proceedings started: 10:33 a.m.) (proceedings ended: 11:18 a.m.)(Deputy Clerk: K. Kratzer)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Alfredo Torrijos, Richard Cornfeld, Daniel Levy, and Vivek Jayaram)(Appearance for Defendant: Andrew Scavotto and Joseph Wylie) (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Docket Text ORDER: The parties involved in 4:19-CV-3335 and 4:20-CV-266 have been invited to participate in the telephone conference scheduled in this case for 4/16/2020. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/15/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Docket Text ORDER: The Telephone Conference has been RESET for 4/16/2020 10:30 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk.The call-in information previously emailed to counsel remains the same. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/13/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Docket Text ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 4/15/2020 11:15 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Parties to participate with number and access code provided separately via email. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/13/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Richard S. Cornfeld. ADR Completion Deadline due by 4/23/2020. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 5/7/2020. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 4/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/24/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings. District Judge Ronnie L. White no longer assigned to case.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/30/2020. (MRC) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 48 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:19-cv-03335-PLC by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Alfredo Torrijos's Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 46) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/26/19. (THL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alfredo Torrijos. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7604989) by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Alfredo Torrijos)(Torrijos, Alfredo) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 45 AMENDED ANSWER to to Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint #15 Amended Complaint, amended form filer filed by Compass Group USA, Inc. filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 09/26/2019. (TMT) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File (Proposed) Supplemental Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer (ECF No. #41 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. #27 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #25 ) is GRANTED, in part, as it relates to Plaintiffs' claims for conversion under Illinois law, and DENIED, in part, as it relates to the other arguments. Consequently, Count VII is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. is reminded of its obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Counts IV, V, VI, VIII, and IX within the time set by the rules. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.'s Motion for Entry of a Protective Order (ECF No. #37 ) is DENIED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Counter Motion for Entry of Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order (ECF No. #38 ) is GRANTED, and the Court will issue the protective order subsequent to this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/26/2019. (TMT) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION for Leave to File (Proposed) Supplemental Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File (Proposed) Supplemental Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' (Proposed) Supplemental Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 1 - Oliver Stipulation of Case Dismissal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Oliver Notification of Docket Entry of Dismissal)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 3, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM re #38 Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Counter Motion for Entry of Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION for Protective Order and Counter Motion for Entry of Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolina filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolina filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Alexandria D. Bond's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. (ECF No. 31) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/4/19. (THL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 31 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Alexandria Bond by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Bond, Alexandria) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. 29) is GRANTED up to and including March 11, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the parties' agreement, Defendant's reply briefs shall be due April 1, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/6/19. (THL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolina, #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolina filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolina by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Class Action Complaint) by Compass Group USA, Inc..(Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Three Motion to Join Parties due by 5/24/2019. ADR Future Reference 3/23/2020. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/25/2019. (KCB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference, previously set for January 31, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., is CANCELED. The Court will issue a Case Management Order based upon the parties Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/25/19. (THL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan (ECF No. 19) is GRANTED up to and including January 24, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Rule 16 Conference is set for January 31, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of Judge Ronnie L. White. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/10/19. (THL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel Scott Levy for Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Levy, Daniel) (The address has been updated in CM/ECF.) Modified on 1/11/2019 (LMR). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 16) is GRANTED up to and including January 31, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/2/19. (THL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs no Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued no, Consents issued no, Jury demand, , filed by George Moore, Virginia Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cornfeld, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 CJRA ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen to District Judge Ronnie L. White. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (EAB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track: 3. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/10/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 11/30/18. (EAB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Compass Group USA, Inc..(Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexandria D. Bond by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.; #7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph C. Wylie II) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. and #8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul W. Sweeney Jr. by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. ; ORDERED: Motions are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on November 26, 2018. (MCB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexandria D. Bond. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6890999) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bond, Alexandria) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul W. Sweeney Jr.. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6890954) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sweeney, Paul) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph C. Wylie II. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6890915) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Wylie, Joseph) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jaclyn Niccole Warr for Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Warr, Jaclyn) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MFG) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc., d/b/a Canteen. Parent companies: Compass Group PLC, Publicly held company: no,. (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc., d/b/a Canteen Sent To: Plaintiff (Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1822-CC11485, with receipt number 0865-6888185, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Compass Group USA, Inc., d/b/a Canteen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scavotto, Andrew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]
November 21, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/1/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore, et al. v. Compass Group USA, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Moore
Represented By: Elise R Sanguinetti
Represented By: Daniel Scott Levy
Represented By: Michael Anthony Jenkins
Represented By: Mickel M. Arias
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Represented By: Joel R. Rhine
Represented By: Martin A. Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Carter
Represented By: Michael Anthony Jenkins
Represented By: Mickel M. Arias
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Represented By: Daniel Scott Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jilek
Represented By: Michael Anthony Jenkins
Represented By: Mickel M. Arias
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Represented By: Daniel Scott Levy
Represented By: Joel R. Rhine
Represented By: Martin A. Ramey
Represented By: Michel M. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Francis Jaye
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sean Madelmayer
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc. doing business as Canteen
Represented By: Christina N Goodrich
Represented By: Joseph C. Wylie, II
Represented By: Kathryn G Hummel
Represented By: Kenn Brotman
Represented By: Nicole C Mueller
Represented By: Paul W. Sweeney, Jr.
Represented By: Marla Tun Reschly
Represented By: Daniel Drew McClurg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?