Doe v. American Airlines Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc., John Does 1-10 and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2023cv00819
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Early Discovery by Jane Doe. Responses due by 1/30/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Buric, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Patrick J. Kearns for American Airlines Group Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/14/24. (mga)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Chandler Teraoka for American Airlines Group Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/14/24. (mga)
January 16, 2024 Notice to Chandler M. Teraoka: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 1/23/2024. (mga)
January 16, 2024 Notice to Patrick J. Kearns: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 1/23/2024. (mga)
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla Joanne Jones on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Jones, Kayla)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick Kearns Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6364665. by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Jones, Kayla). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chandler Teraoka Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6364648. by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Jones, Kayla). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 Miscellaneous Filing by Jane Doe. Designation of Secure Leave (Buric, John)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Erin H. Reding for Jane Doe (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/12/23. (mga)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Paul T. Llewellyn for Jane Doe (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/12/23. (mga)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erin H. Reding Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6326959. by Jane Doe. (Buric, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 12, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul T. Llewellyn Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6326940. by Jane Doe. (Buric, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 12, 2023 Notice to Erin H. Reding: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 12/19/2023. (mga)
December 12, 2023 Notice to Paul T. Llewellyn: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 12/19/2023. (mga)
December 11, 2023 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Airlines Group Inc.. American Airlines Group Inc. waiver sent on 12/1/2023, answer due 1/30/2024. (Grace, Kathryn)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to American Airlines Group Inc., John Does 1-10. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(cjs)
December 1, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(cjs)
December 1, 2023 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (cjs)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6315562), filed by Jane Doe.(Buric, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. American Airlines Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: John Robert Brickley
Represented By: John Robert Buric
Represented By: Paul T. Llewellyn
Represented By: Erin H. Reding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc.
Represented By: Chandler Teraoka
Represented By: Patrick J. Kearns
Represented By: Kayla Joanne Jones
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?