Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P. v. Bush Brothers & Company
Plaintiff: Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.
Defendant: Bush Brothers & Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv00393
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/2/2024. (ams)
June 6, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bush Brothers & Company.(Wood, Fred)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Bush Brothers & Company answer due 6/6/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/14/24. (mga)
May 14, 2024 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Bush Brothers & Company. (Wood, Fred)
May 14, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bush Brothers & Company. (Wood, Fred)
May 14, 2024 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Bush Brothers & Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wood, Fred). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.. Bush Brothers & Company served on 4/26/2024, answer due 5/17/2024. (Wilson, J.)
April 16, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bush Brothers & Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add)
April 16, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(add)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.. (Wilson, J.)
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bush Brothers & Company with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6484198), filed by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P..(Wilson, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P. v. Bush Brothers & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bush Brothers & Company
Represented By: Fred M. Wood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?