Dennie v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Kimberly Dennie
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00454
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1693 Electronic Fund Transfers
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Noah Levine for Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/28/24. (mga)
June 28, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Noah Levine Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6575459. by Bank of America, N.A.. (Brinson, Kobi). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 28, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Non-Contract Claims of the Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Brinson, Kobi)
June 28, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Non-Contract Claims of the Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 7/12/2024 (Brinson, Kobi)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Bank of America, N.A. answer due 6/28/2024.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/29/24. (mga)
May 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Lynette Turner on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Turner, Stephanie)
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brinson, Kobi). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 28, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A.. (Brinson, Kobi)
May 28, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kobi K. Brinson on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Brinson, Kobi)
May 8, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bank of America, N.A.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (llp)
May 8, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(llp)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6508945), filed by Kimberly Dennie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilkerson, David) Modified text on 5/14/2024 (rth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennie v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Dennie
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Kobi K. Brinson
Represented By: Noah Levine
Represented By: Stephanie Lynette Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?