Eco Fiber Inc. v. Yukon Packaging, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eco Fiber Inc.
Defendant: Christopher James Poore, David Kevin Vance, Rabindranauth Heeralall, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC and Yukon Packaging, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00484
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Susan C Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 42 REPORT on the Determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (clc)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER sua sponte as to whether this Court has jurisdiction over this matter. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter is remanded; denying as moot #40 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying as moot #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot #11 Motion to Expedite. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court terminate the hearing related to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/18/24. (clc)
June 17, 2024 Filing 40 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Fees by Eco Fiber Inc.. Responses due by 7/1/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Raab, Christopher)
June 17, 2024 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF on Federal Question Jurisdiction by Eco Fiber Inc. re: #36 Order, Order Setting Response Deadline,, (Raab, Christopher)
June 17, 2024 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF on Federal Question Jurisdiction by Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore, David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC re: #36 Order, Order Setting Response Deadline,, (Long, Samuel)
June 13, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Consolidation of Cases re: Case Nos. 3:24-cv-465 and 3:24-cv-484 (Long, Samuel)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER sua sponte as to whether this Court has jurisdiction over this matter. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that supplemental briefs on the issue of this Courts jurisdiction shall be filed no later than NOON, ON JUNE 17, 2024 ( Suplemental Briefs due by noon 6/17/2024 ). Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/13/24. (clc)
June 11, 2024 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Eco Fiber Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Kent Schneider, Jr.)(Raab, Christopher)
June 8, 2024 Filing 34 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #33 Sealed Document, (Exhibit I to Declaration of Christopher James Poore #31 by Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore, David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC. Responses due by 6/24/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exhibit I to Declaration of Christopher James Poore) (Long, Samuel). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
June 8, 2024 Filing 33 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibit I to #31 Vendor Pricing Agreement re: #31 Declaration,, by Defendants; (available to Eco Fiber Inc., Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore, David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC) (Long, Samuel)
June 8, 2024 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #34 Consent MOTION to Seal Document re #33 Sealed Document (Exhibit I to Declaration of Christopher James Poore #31 ). The subject document contains third party information that is confidential and commercially sensitive. The Clerk is directed to remove the publicly-filed version of this document [31-10] from the docket. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 6/8/2024. (DLG)
June 7, 2024 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Rabindranauth Heeralall re #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, ( #11 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule) filed by Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore, David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Long, Samuel)
June 7, 2024 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Christopher James Poore re #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, ( #11 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule) filed by Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore, David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I - Removed from the Docket per Text-Only Order entered on 6/10/2024, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Long, Samuel) (Attachment 10 replaced on 6/10/2024) (brl). Modified to remove document 31-10 on 6/10/2024 (brl).
June 7, 2024 Filing 30 DECLARATION of David Kevin Vance re #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, ( #11 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule) filed by Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore, David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Long, Samuel)
June 7, 2024 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore, David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC. Replies due by 6/14/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Business Court 2024.05.13 Hearing Transcript)(Long, Samuel)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #26 Motion for Leave to Exceeed Word Count. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants to file a single response to the pending motion, not exceeding 5,500 words.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs reply brief in support of its motion shall be filed no later than Tuesday, June 11, 2024. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/5/24. (clc)
June 5, 2024 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION re #11 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule (EXPEDITED) Opposed Motion for Leave to Exceeed Word Count for Opposition by Eco Fiber Inc.. Replies due by 6/12/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6/3/24 email correspondence)(Raab, Christopher)
June 4, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION re #11 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule (EXPEDITED) Opposed Motion for Leave to Exceeed Word Count for Opposition by Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore, David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC. Responses due by 6/18/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exceed Word Count) (Long, Samuel). Modified to remove magistrate referral on 6/5/2024 (clc).
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendants' #24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint contained in Notice of Removal. Rabindranauth Heeralall answer due 6/20/2024; Christopher James Poore answer due 6/20/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 5/30/24. (mga)
May 30, 2024 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Respond to Complaint by Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore. (Long, Samuel). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
May 30, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Paul Mead on behalf of Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore (Mead, Spencer)
May 30, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tom Bengera on behalf of Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore (Bengera, Tom)
May 30, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Davidson Trimmer on behalf of Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore (Trimmer, Christina)
May 30, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas D. Garber on behalf of Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore (Garber, Lucas)
May 30, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Alexander Long, Jr on behalf of Rabindranauth Heeralall, Christopher James Poore (Long, Samuel)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint contained in the Notice of Removal. David Kevin Vance answer due 6/20/2024; Yukon Packaging, LLC answer due 6/20/2024; Zone 1 Consulting, LLC answer due 6/20/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 5/29/24. (mga)
May 30, 2024 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #11 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule : Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Each side will have 20 minutes for arguments before the Court. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(clc)
May 29, 2024 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 3:24-cv-465 by David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC. Responses due by 6/12/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Long, Samuel). Modified to remove referral on 5/30/2024 (clc).
May 29, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Respond to Complaint by David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC. (Long, Samuel). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
May 28, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #11 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Eco Fiber Inc.. Replies due by 6/4/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from 5.13.24 hearing transcript)(Raab, Christopher)
May 28, 2024 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #11 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 6/7/2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 5/28/2024. (DLG)
May 24, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #11 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule by David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting, LLC. Responses due by 6/7/2024 (Long, Samuel). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
May 23, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McPherson Nunn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nunn, Daniel)
May 23, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Wright on behalf of Eco Fiber Inc. (Wright, James)
May 22, 2024 Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Eco Fiber Inc.. Responses due by 6/5/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit A - Amended Affidavit of Brian Kent Schneider, Sr., #4 Exhibit B - Amended Affidavit of Arturo Mateo, #5 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Brian Kent Schneider, Jr.) (Raab, Christopher). Modified to remove referral on 5/23/2024 (brl).
May 22, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad D. Tillman on behalf of Eco Fiber Inc. (Tillman, Chad)
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (llp)
May 17, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Paul Mead on behalf of David Kevin Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting (Mead, Spencer)
May 17, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tom Bengera on behalf of Kevin David Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting (Bengera, Tom)
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Davidson Trimmer on behalf of Kevin David Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting (Trimmer, Christina)
May 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas D. Garber on behalf of Kevin David Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting (Garber, Lucas)
May 17, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Alexander Long, Jr on behalf of Kevin David Vance, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Zone 1 Consulting (Long, Samuel)
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zone 1 Consulting. (Thurman, Frederick)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yukon Packaging, LLC. (Thurman, Frederick)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of Mecklenburg County (Business Court), case number 24-CVS-20983-590. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6523434), filed by Zone 1 Consulting, Yukon Packaging, LLC, Kevin David Vance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1, #2 Exhibit A 2, #3 Exhibit A 3, #4 Exhibit A 4, #5 Exhibit A 5, #6 Exhibit A 6, #7 Exhibit A 7, #8 Exhibit A 8, #9 Exhibit A 9, #10 Exhibit A 10, #11 Exhibit A 11, #12 Exhibit A 12, #13 Exhibit A 13, #14 Exhibit A 14, #15 Exhibit A 15, #16 Exhibit A 16, #17 Exhibit B, #18 Exhibit C)(Thurman, Frederick)
May 17, 2024 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (llp)
May 17, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(llp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eco Fiber Inc. v. Yukon Packaging, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher James Poore
Represented By: Tom Bengera
Represented By: Spencer Paul Mead
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Long, Jr.
Represented By: Lucas D. Garber
Represented By: Christina Davidson Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kevin Vance
Represented By: Frederick M. Thurman, Jr.
Represented By: Tom Bengera
Represented By: Spencer Paul Mead
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Long, Jr.
Represented By: Lucas D. Garber
Represented By: Christina Davidson Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabindranauth Heeralall
Represented By: Tom Bengera
Represented By: Spencer Paul Mead
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Long, Jr.
Represented By: Lucas D. Garber
Represented By: Christina Davidson Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zone 1 Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Frederick M. Thurman, Jr.
Represented By: Tom Bengera
Represented By: Spencer Paul Mead
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Long, Jr.
Represented By: Lucas D. Garber
Represented By: Christina Davidson Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yukon Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Frederick M. Thurman, Jr.
Represented By: Tom Bengera
Represented By: Spencer Paul Mead
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Long, Jr.
Represented By: Lucas D. Garber
Represented By: Christina Davidson Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eco Fiber Inc.
Represented By: James D. Wright
Represented By: Chad D. Tillman
Represented By: Daniel McPherson Nunn
Represented By: Christopher P. Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?