Black v. Cooper
Petitioner: Martinez Black
Respondent: Billy Cooper
Case Number: 3:2024cv00557
Filed: June 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:23-hc-02230. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
June 12, 2024 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
June 12, 2024 Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 1 (tlj)
June 12, 2024 Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Cases Filed Under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Click on this link to retrieve the #Standing Order (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tlj)
June 12, 2024 ***SET Flag(s): PSLC4 (tlj)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The court TRANSFERS the action to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina where venue is proper. The court has not reviewed the petition or petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, but the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina is better positioned to do so. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 6/11/2024. (Copy of the order sent to petitioner via US Mail.) (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/12/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Change of Address (Eastern CI) filed by Martinez Orlandis Black. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/12/2024.]
October 25, 2023 Filing 4 Letter from Martinez Black requesting a copy of the petition. Courtesy copy sent to petitioner in SASE provided. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/12/2024.]
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/12/2024.]
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Martinez Orlandis Black. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/12/2024.]
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Martinez Orlandis Black. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/12/2024.]
October 13, 2023 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II for initial review. (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/12/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martinez Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Billy Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?