United States of America v. Appelbaum

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Eric Appelbaum
Case Number: 5:2012cv00186
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 66 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Defendant Appelbaum recover nothing in costs or fees from the United States; Appelbaum's Renewed Counterclaim for Refund is denied without prejudice; and Appelbaum's motion for sanctions is denied. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/27/16. (smj)
April 26, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying 68 Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 4/26/2016. (cbb)
April 14, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ordering that the funds as set out in the 70 Consent Judgment entered on April 14, 2016, be returned by no later than May 16, 2016. If the government cannot return the funds by this date, the Court shall require counsel to file a detailed memorandum explaining why the judgment has not been satisfied. See image of Order for complete instructions. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 4/14/2016. (cbb)
March 28, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER setting out deadlines for resolving remaining issues in these consolidated cases. See image of Order attached for details. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 3/28/2016. (cbb)
March 7, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 66 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Taxation of Costs , Set/Reset Deadlines as to 66 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Taxation of Costs .( Responses due by 3/11/2016). Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 3/7/2016. (cbb)
February 3, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 2/3/2016. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (cbb)
December 18, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting extension of time regarding post-trial briefing. Parties shall file post-trial briefs by 1/8/2016. USA will then have 3 days to respond to the objections to the exhibits. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 12/18/2015. (cbb)
November 17, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to maintain all exhibits offered and admitted in this case by either party during, following trial and appeal period. Signed by Frank G. Johns, Clerk on 11/17/15. (smj)
October 2, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that Fed. R. Evid. 408 bars the admission of the Consent Judgment. In the alternative, the Court finds that its admission is barred by Rule 403. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/2/2015. (cbb)
September 22, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to address in a filing with the Court no later than Wednesday, Sept. 30, 2015, the aforementioned issue set out above in this Order. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 9/22/2015. (cbb)
September 19, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting United States' 9 Motion to Dismiss dft's Counterclaims; the Counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice; granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Strike; United States' Motion to S trike Dft's First and Second Defenses is granted; United States' Motion to Strike Dft's Fourth and Sixth Defenses is denied in part and granted in part; the United States' Motion to Strike Dft's Seventh and Ninth Defenses is denied. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 9/19/2014. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Appelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Appelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?