Novak v. Cobb

Defendant: Jennifer Jo Cobb
Plaintiff: David Novak
Case Number: 5:2013cv00032
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Joni S. Cole for Jennifer Jo Cobb. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/27/13. (smj)
October 17, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot 12 Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing as moot 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1); dismissing as moot 2 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 12/17/2013. (cbb)
October 17, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/17/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (cbb)
February 25, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO and staying decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 2/25/2013. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novak v. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Jo Cobb
Represented By: Clark Daniel Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Novak
Represented By: Robert Michael Wells, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.