Jorge Gonzalez-Jaimes v. USA

Petitioner: Jorge Gonzalez-Jaimes
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2013cv00049
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 12/29/2015. (cbb)
October 21, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/21/2015. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (cbb)
February 3, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing petitioner to file an amended motion for relief re 7 Order-USCA remanding case to the district court. Petitioner has until 3/10/14 to file his amended motion. The government shall have 30 days from the filing of the amended motion to respond. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 2/3/14. (smj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jorge Gonzalez-Jaimes v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Gonzalez-Jaimes
Represented By: Ann L. Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Amy E. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?