Luciano v. SunTrust Bank, Inc et al

Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and SunTrust Bank
Plaintiff: Kelli A. Luciano
Case Number: 5:2013cv00050
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Catawba
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Kendall W. Carter for Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/11/13. (smj)
October 16, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Christopher E. Kittell for Kelli A. Luciano. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/16/2013. (cbb)
November 15, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added J. Anthony Love for Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/15/2013. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luciano v. SunTrust Bank, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: David Glen Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Ashley Austin Edwards
Represented By: William L. Esser, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli A. Luciano
Represented By: Don L. Coomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.