AGI Associates, LLC v. Profile Aviation Center, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: AGI Associates, LLC
Defendant: Profile Aviation Center, Inc. and City of Hickory, North Carolina
Case Number: 5:2013cv00061
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 41 Report of Mediation stating parties have reached a settlement in case and directing parties to file a Stipulation of Dismissal by 8/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/14/2015. (cbb)
March 20, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal. Parties shall file a status report, jointly if possible, within 14 days of Fourth Circuit's ruling in this matter. At that time, parties shall also file proposed deadlines for governing the remainder of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/20/2014. (cbb)
September 6, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 18 Limited Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re 4 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/5/13. (smj)
August 21, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Dfts' 8 Motion to Dismiss. Plf's claims for Disgorgement of Rents and Unjust Enrichment survive Rule 12(b)(6) scrutiny while Plf's claims for Judicial Foreclosure a nd Accounting of Rents are moot and subject to dismissal. Plf's Breach of Contract claim against Profile, which is not implicated by the instant Memorandum and Order, remains a viable claim as well. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 8/20/2013. (cbb)
April 11, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Transfer to Statesville Division. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/10/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGI Associates, LLC v. Profile Aviation Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGI Associates, LLC
Represented By: David Anderson Carmen
Represented By: Edward B. Davis
Represented By: Adam Taylor Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Profile Aviation Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hickory, North Carolina
Represented By: J. Samuel Gorham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?