Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Wright
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Carl David Wright
Case Number: 5:2013cv00092
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Entry of Monetary Penalty. The June 11, 2015,Order and Memorandum are hereby reinstated. The parties shall abide by the terms of the Supplemental Order entered on June 11, 2015. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/9/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER vacating re 11 Memorandum and 12 Supplemental Order Assessing Civil Monetary Penalty. Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Reopen Matter and for Entry of Civil Monetary Penalty is still pending before the Court. Defend ant shall have 14 days after receipt of the material listed to file a Response opposing the motion. Plaintiff may file a reply within 7 days after receipt of Defendant's Response. The Clerk is directed to mail the following to the Defendant's address in West Virginia: documents nos. 7, 9, 10, 11, 12 and this instant Order. Defendant's response is due by 6/29/15. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 6/12/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER ASSESSING CIVIL MONETARY PENALTY AGAINST DEFENDANT CARL DAVID WRIGHT re 11 Memorandum granting Motion for Entry of Civil Monetary Penalty. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 6/11/15. (smj)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief Against Defendant Carl David Wright granting 4 Consent Motion for Permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/28/13. (smj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Ava M. Gould
Represented By: Jennifer E. Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl David Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?