Alonso et al v. Raymond Timber Framed Homes, LLC

Plaintiff: Manuel Alonso and Sheryl Alonso
Defendant: Raymond Timber Framed Homes, LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv00143
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Watauga
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/24/2014. (cbb)
December 23, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 Report of Mediation - case completely settled. Case Settlement Deadline 1/23/2015 or in the alternative request an extension of time to file such dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/23/14. (smj)
February 2, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 Report of Mediation filed on 12/22/2014 directing parties to file a Status Report or a Stipulation of Dismissal on or before 2/6/2015. ( Status Report due by 2/6/2015). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/2/2015. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonso et al v. Raymond Timber Framed Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Alonso
Represented By: John Waldo Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Alonso
Represented By: John Waldo Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Timber Framed Homes, LLC
Represented By: Paul Augustus Capua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.