Lineberger v. Lowe et al

Plaintiff: Alvin Lineberger
Defendant: Jeffrey Lowe, Sonnie Yang, Beal Cloninger and Newton Police Department
Case Number: 5:2014cv00137
Filed: August 19, 2014
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Dfts' Second 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/11/2016. (cbb)
September 23, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 9/23/16. (smj)
June 10, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot and without prejudice 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; affirming 58 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 6/10/2016. (cbb)
February 24, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/23/16. (smj)
May 14, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ordering that on or before Friday, May 29, 2015, plf Lineberger shall provide updated personal financial information (including a sworn affidavit) to the Court, to be filed under seal, so the Court may revisit the indigency status of plf Lineberger. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 5/14/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
September 24, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part re 5 Amended MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee due by 10/27/2014. Failure to comply could result in the summary dismissal of the Plaintiff's case. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 9/24/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lineberger v. Lowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Lineberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonnie Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beal Cloninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?