Jackson v. Rock-Tenn Converting Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Luther Dean Jackson |
Defendant: |
Rock-Tenn Converting Company, RockTenn CP, LLC, Rock-Tenn Financial, Inc., Rock-Tenn Services, Inc., Rock-Tenn Shared Services, LLC and RockTenn-Southern Container, LLC |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv00149 |
Filed: |
September 15, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Statesville Office |
County: |
Iredell |
Presiding Judge: |
David Keesler |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard Voorhees |
Nature of Suit: |
Employment |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 11, 2015 |
Filing
16
ORDER directed parties to file a Stipulation of Dismissal (or Mot/Ext/Time) in this case by 6/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/11/2015. (cbb)
|
April 28, 2015 |
Filing
14
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/28/15. (smj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Jackson v. Rock-Tenn Converting Company et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Luther Dean Jackson |
Represented By: |
Jennifer Diane Gilbert |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Rock-Tenn Converting Company |
Represented By: |
William J. McMahon, IV |
Represented By: |
Kristine Marie Sims |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: RockTenn CP, LLC |
Represented By: |
William J. McMahon, IV |
Represented By: |
Kristine Marie Sims |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Rock-Tenn Financial, Inc. |
Represented By: |
William J. McMahon, IV |
Represented By: |
Kristine Marie Sims |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Rock-Tenn Services, Inc. |
Represented By: |
William J. McMahon, IV |
Represented By: |
Kristine Marie Sims |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Rock-Tenn Shared Services, LLC |
Represented By: |
William J. McMahon, IV |
Represented By: |
Kristine Marie Sims |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: RockTenn-Southern Container, LLC |
Represented By: |
William J. McMahon, IV |
Represented By: |
Kristine Marie Sims |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?