Swan Racing Company, LLC v. XXXtreme Motorsport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Swan Racing Company, LLC |
Defendant: |
XXXtreme Motorsport, LLC and Johnathan Cohen |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv00155 |
Filed: |
September 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Statesville Office |
County: |
Iredell |
Presiding Judge: |
David Keesler |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard Voorhees |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 4, 2022 |
Filing
88
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 87 Motion for Final Execution and Issuance of Writ of Execution. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 11/4/2022. (mek)
|
November 23, 2016 |
Filing
82
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/23/16. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (smj)
|
October 11, 2016 |
Filing
76
ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 52 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Swan and Davis shall submit the requested memorandu m on interest and attorney's fees, as well as an affidavit from an independent attorney attesting to the reasonableness of the requested attorney's fees, no later than 10/26/2016. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/11/2016. (cbb)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting 64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Piken for Johnathan Cohen. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/19/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
|
April 8, 2016 |
Filing
43
ORDER that Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE on or before the 4/25/16, why counsel's 42 Renewed And Amended Motion To Withdraw should not be allowed. Defendants shall file a response to 38 Joint MOTION to Compel Discovery on or before 5/2/2016. The Clerk shall send this Order to Defendants at the address provided in document no. 42 by certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/7/16. (smj)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM and ORDER that Defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint's Ninth Claim for Relief is hereby DENIED; and Plaintiff's/Third-Party Defendant's concurrent 25 , 26 Motions to Dismiss the Counterclaim/Third Party Complaint's Second and Third Claims for Relief are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/20/2015. (tmg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?