Adams v. Medtronic Minimed, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Betty Adams
Defendant: Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. and Convatec inc
Case Number: 5:2015cv00071
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice upon the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/26/2017. (tmg)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Global Mediation. Case is stayed until 7/10/2017. See Order for further details regarding deadlines and hearings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/3/2017. (kby)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Nicole Narotzky for Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,Nicole Narotzky for Medtronic, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/31/2016. (cbb)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/8/2016. (cbb)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Daniel Scott Aberson for Medtronic Minimed, Inc. and Medtronic, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/19/15. (smj)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Leslie J. Suson for Convatec, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/21/15. (smj)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Emily M. Rome for Medtronic Minimed, Inc. and for Medtronic, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/4/15. (smj)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Charles Rene Houssiere, III for Betty Adams. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/7/2015. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Medtronic Minimed, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Adams
Represented By: Walter E. Daniels, III
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Minimed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convatec inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?