Gulyas v. Appalachian State University et al

Plaintiff: Frank Gulyas
Defendant: Appalachian State University, University of North Carolina, Cindy A. Wallace, Judith Haas, David J. Elrod and Darrell P. Kruger
Case Number: 5:2016cv00225
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Watauga
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal in this case by 5/16/2018; denying as moot 48 MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/17/2018. (tmg)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/8/2018. (tmg)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/26/2017. (nvc)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Counts Three, Four, and Five of Plaintiff's Complaint and those counts are DISMISSED. Plaintiff may proceed on all other claims. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 8/28/2017. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulyas v. Appalachian State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Gulyas
Represented By: John West Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appalachian State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell P. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?