Estes v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Dennis Wayne Estes
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2016cv00232
Filed: December 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Caldwell
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 19 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/13/2018. (nvc)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/8/2018. (nvc)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/12/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (nvc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estes v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Wayne Estes
Represented By: Fred D. Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?