Sebastian et al v. DAVOL, INC. et al

Plaintiff: Kay Sebastian and Michael Dobrzynski
Defendant: DAVOL, INC. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00006
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Wilkes
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Eric L. Alexander, Matthew D. Jacobson for C.R. Bard, Inc. and DAVOL, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/25/2017. (nvc)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER sua sponte to set a deadline for the parties to file an amended Certification and Report of F.R.C.P. 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan that complies with the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney. Parties shall have up to and including 9/16/2017 to file amended document. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/8/2017. (nvc)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot Defendants' 4 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction. Granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to terminate Michael Dobrzynski as a Plaintiff in this action. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 8/3/2017. (nvc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sebastian et al v. DAVOL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Sebastian
Represented By: Lawrence Egerton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dobrzynski
Represented By: Lawrence Egerton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVOL, INC.
Represented By: Candace Scott Friel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Candace Scott Friel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?