Swift Beef Company v. Alex Lee, Inc.

Plaintiff: Swift Beef Company
Defendant: Alex Lee, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00176
Filed: October 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 Motion to Stay all Pretrial Deadlines Pending Judicial Settlement Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Judicial Settlement Conference does not result in the resolution of this case, the Parties shall meet and confer and present the Court with a proposed scheduling order within fourteen days after the Judicial Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/18/2019. (nvc)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re 87 Order on Motion. Judicial Settlement Conference set for 4/11/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall reserve Courtroom #1-1 and its attached conference rooms. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/11/2019. (nvc)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER, having considered the issues in conformity with the instructions of the Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, plaintiff's Emergency 3 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, which has been converted to a motion for preliminary injunction, is denied. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/22/2019. (nvc)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Setting Hearing, Oral Argument set for 2/15/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Plaintiff shall file a Supporting supplemental brief, limited to five p ages, not later than 2/11/2019. Defendant shall file a Responsive supplemental brief limited to five pages not later than 2/12/2019, and plaintiff may file a three-page supplemental Reply brief not later than 2/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/7/2019. (nvc)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 56 , 57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Karla L. Johnson and Alexander M. Madrid for Alex Lee, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/15/2018. (nvc)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 30 Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/8/2018. (nvc)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 20 Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/12/2018. (nvc)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/20/2017. (chh)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/17/2017. (nvc)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 3 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice and a TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER is issued restraining defendant ALEX LEE, INC from ev icting plaintiff SWIFT BEEF COMPANY from the premises of the Lenoir plant or otherwise terminating the Agreements. Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing calendared for 10/13/17 @ 2:00. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/5/2017. (tmg) Modified hearing time on 10/5/2017 (tmg).
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 7 , 8 , 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Clayton E. Bailey, Alexander Brauer, Benjamin L. Stewart for Swift Beef Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/4/2017. (nvc) Modified text on 10/4/2017 (nvc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swift Beef Company v. Alex Lee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swift Beef Company
Represented By: Clayton E. Bailey
Represented By: Alexander Brauer
Represented By: Thomas G. Hooper
Represented By: Benjamin L. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Lee, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W. Kinghorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?