Robichaud v. Engage2Excel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James A. Robichaud
Defendant: Engage2Excel, Inc, Comvest Investment Partners Holdings, LLC, E2E Holdings, Inc, GC Representative Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A. and Phillip Stewart
Case Number: 5:2018cv00086
Filed: May 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Defendant's 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case shall proceed to discovery on the merits of the remaining claim in the absence of a voluntary resolution of the dispute among the parties. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 12/12/2019. (nvc)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 53 MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/29/2019. (nvc)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss and 24 Motion to Dismiss. See order for further details . Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/9/2019. (nvc)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Settlement. Having withdrawn the notice, parties are directed to file a joint report on the status of this matter within 10 days of this order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/11/2019. (nvc)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert M. Kline for Comvest Investment Partners Holdings, LLC, E2E Holdings, Inc, Engage2Excel, Inc, Phillip Stewart. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/17/2019. (tmg)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 9 Motion to Dismiss and 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/27/2018. (nvc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robichaud v. Engage2Excel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Robichaud
Represented By: Colin Thomas Dean
Represented By: Sean C. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engage2Excel, Inc
Represented By: James B. Gatehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comvest Investment Partners Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James B. Gatehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E2E Holdings, Inc
Represented By: James B. Gatehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Representative Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark Andrew Nebrig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael R Hoernlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?