United States of America v. Approximately $3,554 in Funds
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $3,554 in Funds
Case Number: 5:2018cv00125
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Catawba
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 7, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Tiffany)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service (Direct Notice) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Tiffany)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT Returned Executed on 8/9/2018 as to Approximately $3,554.00 in funds. (nvc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property for Approximately $3,554 in Funds Seized from Donovon Tyrell Lortz (nvc)
August 8, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Approximately $3,554 in Funds, filed by United States of America.(Moore, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $3,554 in Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,554 in Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tiffany Mallory Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?