Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Spencer Gifts, LLC
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Spencer Gifts, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00155
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Spencer Gifts, LLC answer due 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/20/2018. (tmg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Spencer Gifts, LLC. (Wilson, Nicholas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spencer Gifts, LLC (Wilson, Nicholas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Damian Wilson on behalf of Spencer Gifts, LLC (Wilson, Nicholas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Spencer Gifts, LLC waiver sent on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Returned Executed)(Christy, Katherine)
September 26, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to CT Corporation Systems on September 26, 2018 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons)(Christy, Katherine)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Spencer Gifts, LLC with Jury Demand, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Christy, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Spencer Gifts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Katherine Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Gifts, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Damian Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?