The Travelers Indemnity Company of America v. Schwarz & Schwarz, LLC et al

Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Defendant: Schwarz Properties L.L.C. and Schwarz & Schwarz, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00017
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs response is due by 4/23/2019 and defendants replies due by 5/7/2019. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/29/2019. (nvc)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schwarz Properties L.L.C. (Long, Joshua)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schwarz & Schwarz, LLC (Long, Joshua)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Nalibotsky, Albert). Modified to remove referral on 3/28/2019 (mga).
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Schwarz & Schwarz, LLC, Schwarz Properties L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Long, Joshua)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Schwarz & Schwarz, LLC, Schwarz Properties L.L.C.. Responses due by 4/9/2019 (Long, Joshua)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Forrest Pescud Long on behalf of All Defendants (Long, Joshua)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. Schwarz Properties L.L.C. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Nalibotsky, Albert)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. Schwarz & Schwarz, LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Nalibotsky, Albert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Schwarz & Schwarz, LLC, Schwarz Properties L.L.C.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
February 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America (Nalibotsky, Albert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3942565), filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America.(Nalibotsky, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America v. Schwarz & Schwarz, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Properties L.L.C.
Represented By: Joshua Forrest Pescud Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz & Schwarz, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Forrest Pescud Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Albert Sanford Nalibotsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?