Kluhsman Machine, Inc. v. Dino Paoli SRL et al

Plaintiff: Kluhsman Machine, Inc.
Defendant: United Race Parts LLC and Dino Paoli SRL
Case Number: 5:2019cv00020
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Kluhsman Machine, Inc. by United Race Parts LLC.(Whitmyer, Wesley)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Race Parts LLC (Whitmyer, Wesley)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Kluhsman Machine, Inc.. United Race Parts LLC served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Friedman, Ana)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. United Race Parts LLC answer due 4/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/29/2019. (nvc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by United Race Parts LLC. (Whitmyer, Wesley). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 18, 2019 Notice to Robert D. Keeler and Wesley W. Whitmyer, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/25/2019. (nvc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 , #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert D. Keeler, Wesley W. Whitmyer, Jr for United Race Parts LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/18/2019. (nvc)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Wesley W.Whitmyer, Jr. Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3969047. by United Race Parts LLC. (Ladenheim, Matthew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert D. Keeler Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3969034. by United Race Parts LLC. (Ladenheim, Matthew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Ladenheim on behalf of United Race Parts LLC (Ladenheim, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Morrow, Jr on behalf of Kluhsman Machine, Inc. (Morrow, John)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana J. Friedman on behalf of Kluhsman Machine, Inc. (Friedman, Ana)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dino Paoli SRL, United Race Parts LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
March 1, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (nvc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent number 8,899,134. (nvc)
March 1, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Boaz on behalf of Kluhsman Machine, Inc. (Boaz, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kluhsman Machine, Inc. (Boaz, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dino Paoli SRL, United Race Parts LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3955522), filed by Kluhsman Machine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,899,134)(Boaz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kluhsman Machine, Inc. v. Dino Paoli SRL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Race Parts LLC
Represented By: Wesley W. Whitmyer, Jr.
Represented By: Robert D. Keeler
Represented By: Matthew J. Ladenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dino Paoli SRL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kluhsman Machine, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Boaz
Represented By: Ana J. Friedman
Represented By: John F. Morrow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?