Penland et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Teresa Penland and Kristopher G. Penland
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00081
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 4-5 days. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Motions due by 4/30/2020. Mediator Designation deadline set for 9/27/2019. Mediation deadline set for 4/16/2020. Jury Trial set for 9/21/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/26/2019. (nvc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Hausler, Kurt)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/17/2019. (nvc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Hall, Jonathan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teresa Penland (Hausler, Kurt)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kristopher G. Penland (Hausler, Kurt)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt F. Hausler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hausler, Kurt)
June 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E. Hall on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Hall, Jonathan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Hall, Jonathan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from North Carolina Iredell County, case number 19 CVS 1362. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4064459), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint)(Hall, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penland et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Penland
Represented By: Kurt F. Hausler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher G. Penland
Represented By: Kurt F. Hausler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jonathan E. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?