Stone v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kara Christine Stone
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00089
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Kara Christine Stone (Smith, Spencer)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Consent Notice to Substitute Attorney Spencer A. Smith by Kara Christine Stone. (Smith, Spencer). Modified to change event to Notice 7/8/2019 (tob).
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Nationwide General Insurance Company shall have up to and including July 29, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/3/19. (mga)
July 3, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)
July 3, 2019 Notice to J. Rodney Caudill: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Bar of this Court. Deadline by 7/10/2019. (nvc)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David Keesler: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Brown, R.) Motion referred to David Keesler. Modified referral on 7/3/2019 (nvc).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Scott Brown on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company (Brown, R.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company (Brown, R.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Iredell County, District Court Division, case number 19 CVD 1339. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4082823), filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Case Assignment Notice #4 Cover Sheet) (Brown, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Scott Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Christine Stone
Represented By: J. Rodney Caudill
Represented By: Spencer Aubrey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?