Cobble Creek Lumber, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Cobble Creek Lumber, LLC
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Calf Mountain, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00102
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference by Cobble Creek Lumber, LLC re Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Judge Bell Civil Standing Order Requiring ISC, (DeGeorge, R.)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file Certificate of Settlement Conference. Certificate due by September 19, 2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/05/2019. (DLG)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Calf Mountain, LLC (Silverman, William)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Silverman on behalf of Calf Mountain, LLC (Silverman, William)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Settlement Conference by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/19/2019 (Langdon, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Langdon, J.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal,, by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Langdon, J.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cobble Creek Lumber, LLC (DeGeorge, R.)
July 31, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (mek)
July 31, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE: Case was filed in wrong division. Case has been copied from 3:19-cv-00369 to 5:19-cv-00102. Please use 5:19-cv-00102 for all future pleadings. (mek)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Calf Mountain, LLC. (Contained in State Court Pleadings - Doc. 1 Exhibit 5) (mek)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Ashe County, case number 19 CVS 219. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4116758), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cobble Creek Complaint, #3 Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co. Process, #4 Cobble Creek's Affidavit of Service, #5 Calf Mtn.'s Answer, #6 Calf Mtn.'s Consent, #7 Cobble Creek Annual Report, #8 Liberty Mutual Fire's Registration in Massachusetts, #9 Calf Mtn.'s Registration in Virginia)(Langdon, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobble Creek Lumber, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Mark Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calf Mountain, LLC
Represented By: William W. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobble Creek Lumber, LLC
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?