Swedlund v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Robert Dean Swedlund
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00127
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Acknowledged receipt of electronically transferred case by USDC California Northern District, their civil action no. 3:19-cv-7403.(rth)
November 7, 2019 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (tmg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL (CTO-164) transferring case to Northern District of California, MDL# 2741. Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (tmg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Dean Swedlund. Monsanto Company served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Martin, Jean)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Monsanto Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
September 30, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)
September 30, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4200458), filed by Robert Dean Swedlund. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Martin, Jean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swedlund v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dean Swedlund
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?