James v. McLaughlin et al
Plaintiff: Debra Sheree James
Defendant: United States of America and John Martin McLaughlin
Case Number: 5:2019cv00130
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by John Martin McLaughlin. (Bolster, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by John Martin McLaughlin. Responses due by 12/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Bolster, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. John Martin McLaughlin answer due 12/13/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/8/2019. (KCA)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by John Martin McLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bolster, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Debra Sheree James. United States of America served on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Dickinson, Paul)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Debra Sheree James. John Martin McLaughlin served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dickinson, Paul)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Debra Sheree James (Dickinson, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Martin McLaughlin, United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
October 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4219004), filed by Debra Sheree James.(Dickinson, Paul) Modified on 10/16/2019 to remove duplicate text(rth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. McLaughlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Martin McLaughlin
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Bolster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Sheree James
Represented By: Paul Robert Dickinson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?