Watkins v. Copeland et al
Plaintiff: Van Brett Pierre Watkins
Defendant: FNU Brown, FNU Walker, FNU Howell, John/Jane Does, FNU Moss, FNU Copeland and FNU Poteat
Case Number: 5:2019cv00162
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Van Brett Pierre Watkins Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 1/28/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by NCDPS as to Van Brett Pierre Watkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Van Brett Pierre Watkins #1 Envelope (tmg) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/23/2020) (nvc).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/10/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 Letter re: requesting inmate payment statement from Van Brett Pierre Watkins (Attachments: #1 Incomplete Proposed Summons for Alexander CI, #2 Envelope)(nvc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Van Brett Pierre Watkins (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Copy of Complaint, #3 Envelope) (tmg)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $400.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 12/31/2019. (tmg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Van Brett Pierre Watkins (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Copeland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Poteat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Brett Pierre Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?